EP1713780 - NOVEL INHIBITORS OF GLUTAMINYL CYCLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Probiodrug AG Weinbergweg 22, Biozentrum 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILLING, Stephan Glockenweg 4 06130 Halle/Saale / DE | 02 /
BUCHHOLZ, Mirko Brandenburger Strasse 6 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | 03 /
NIESTROJ, André, Johannes Thälmannplatz 1 06193 Sennewitz / DE | 04 /
DEMUTH, Hans-Ulrich Hegelstrasse 14 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | 05 /
HEISER, Ulrich Franz-Schubert-Strasse 5 06108 Halle/Saale / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
SCHILLING, Stephan Läuferweg 4 06128 Halle/Saale / DE | ||
02 /
BUCHHOLZ, Mirko Brandenburger Strasse 6 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | |||
03 /
NIESTROJ, André, Johannes Thälmannplatz 1 06193 Sennewitz / DE | |||
04 /
DEMUTH, Hans-Ulrich Hegelstrasse 14 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | |||
05 /
HEISER, Ulrich Franz-Schubert-Strasse 5 06108 Halle/Saale / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Matthias, et al Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2012/29] |
Former [2012/03] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 05707206.8 | 04.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005EP01153 | Priority number, date | US20040542133P | 05.02.2004 Original published format: US 542133 P | US20040838993 | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 838993 | US20040634364P | 08.12.2004 Original published format: US 634364 P | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005075436 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713780 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713780 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/61, C07D405/12, C07D417/12, C07D403/12, C07D235/06, A61K31/4164, A61P25/14, A61P25/28, A61K38/06 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/4164 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/61 (KR);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D233/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D235/06 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Title | German: | NEUE INHIBITOREN VON GLUTAMINYLCYCLASE | [2006/43] | English: | NOVEL INHIBITORS OF GLUTAMINYL CYCLASE | [2006/43] | French: | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE LA GLUTAMINYL-CYCLASE | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/46] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | PL | 18.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BG | 18.04.2012 | |
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BG | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2004098625 (PROBIODRUG AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-57 * claims 28,37 * * page 42; compound - *; | [LXP]WO2004098591 (PROBIODRUG AG [DE], et al) [LXP] 1-57 * claim 4 * * claim 26 * * page 56 - page 59; examples 1-40 *; | [X]WO9964420 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-28,42-57 * page 59 - page 60; compounds 1-16 * * claim 35 *; | [X]WO9920599 (CAMBRIDGE NEUROSCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1-28,42-57 * claim 33 * * page 60, lines 26,27; claim 11 * * page 61, line 10; claim 11 *; | [X]WO9743278 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-57 * examples 1,4-811 * * page 26, line 4 - line 5 * * page 29, line 25 - line 27 *; | [X]WO02066459 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 28; table . *; | [X]WO0216318 (PACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 143; compounds 16-42 *; | [X]DE3210009 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-26 * page 52; example 9 * | [X] - SCHILLING S ET AL, "Identification of human glutaminyl cyclase as a metalloenzyme. POTENT INHIBITION BY IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND HETEROCYCLIC CHELATORS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20031212), vol. 278, no. 50, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 49773 - 49779, XP002324506 [X] 1-27 * page 49775; table . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M309077200 | [X] - DRESSMAN B A ET AL, "Solid Phase Synthesis of Urea Libraries Using a Diversifiable Thiophenoxy Carbonyl Linker", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980528), vol. 39, no. 22, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3631 - 3634, XP004118698 [X] 1-26 * table 1; compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00652-2 | [X] - VISSER A E ET AL., "Task-specific ionic liquids for the extraction of metal ions from aqueous solutions", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS., CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON., (2001), no. 1, pages 135 - 136, XP002339047 [X] 1-26 * precursors of compounds 2-6; cf. synthesis on page 136 column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b008041l | by applicant | EP0117462 | WO9815647 | WO03057204 | WO2004039773 | GB2385124 | GB2389113 | US2002115616 | WO0187293 | WO03057165 | WO2004052348 | WO2004062652 | JPH0356460 | EP0384341 | WO9012005 | JPH0356461 | JPH0356462 | EP0491212 | EP0286928 | JPS6442465 | JPH0331298B | JP4208299B | WO0071144 | US5847155 | JPH0940693 | JPH1077300 | JPH05331072 | JPH0515314B | WO9515310 | WO9300361 | EP0556482 | JPH06234693 | JPS6468396 | EP0709373 | US5965556 | US5756763 | US6121311 | JPS63264454 | JPS6469B | JPS63162672 | EP0268190 | EP0277588 | EP0275482 | US4977180 | US5091406 | US4983624 | US5112847 | US5100904 | US5254550 | US5262431 | US5340832 | US4956380 | EP0303434 | JPH0356486B | JPH01143897 | JPH01226880 | EP0280956 | US4857537 | EP0461677 | EP0345428 | JPH02275858 | US5506256 | JPH06192298 | EP0618193 | JP3255080B | EP0468469 | US5118811 | JPH0525125B | WO9313065 | JPH05201970 | WO9412474 | EP0670309 | EP0451547 | JPH06339390 | US5073549 | US4999349 | EP0268281 | US4743616 | EP0232849 | EP0224272 | JPS62114978 | JPS62114957 | US4757083 | US4810721 | US5198458 | US4826870 | EP0201742 | EP0201741 | US4873342 | EP0172458 | JPS6137764B | EP0201743 | US4772587 | EP0372484 | US5028604 | WO9118877 | JPH049367B | JP4235162B | US5407950 | WO9501352 | JPH01250370 | JPH02207070 | US5221752 | EP0468339 | JP4211648B | WO9946272 | WO0068197 | EP0614911 | EP0747357 | EP0747356 | EP0747378 | WO9417035 | WO9719911 | WO9719913 | WO9612489 | WO9719914 | WO9622305 | WO9640660 | WO9612490 | WO9709308 | WO9720820 | WO9720821 | WO9720822 | WO9720823 | WO9719682 | WO9725041 | WO9734843 | WO9746250 | WO9803492 | WO9803493 | WO9803494 | WO9807420 | WO0030674 | US5552411 | US5663192 | US5567714 | US6114336 | JPH09157253 | WO9400486 | WO9312139 | WO9500161 | WO9915498 | US5328899 | DE3939797 | EP0355794 | EP0355793 | JPH06116284 | JPH07267988 | US6380398 | US6011155 | US6107317 | US6110949 | US6124305 | US6172081 | WO9515309 | WO9961431 | WO9967278 | WO9967279 | DE19834591 | WO9740832 | DE19616486 | WO9819998 | WO0007617 | WO9938501 | WO0168603 | WO0140180 | WO0181337 | WO0181304 | WO0155105 | WO0202560 | WO0214271 | WO0204610 | WO02051836 | WO02068420 | WO02076450 | WO02083128 | WO0238541 | WO03000180 | WO03000181 | WO03000250 | WO03002530 | WO03002531 | WO03002553 | WO03002593 | WO03004496 | WO03004498 | WO03024965 | WO03024942 | WO03035067 | WO03037327 | WO03035057 | WO03045977 | WO03055881 | WO03068748 | WO03068757 | WO03057666 | WO03057144 | WO03040174 | WO03033524 | WO03074500 | WO2004009859 | - GANELLIN ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1995), vol. 38, no. 17, pages 3342 - 3350 | - VENKATACHALAM ET AL., BIOORGANIC MED CHEM LETT, (2001), vol. 11, pages 523 - 528 | - MOON ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1991), vol. 34, pages 2314 - 2327 | - WRIGHT ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1986), vol. 29, pages 523 - 530 | - WRIGHT ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1987), vol. 30, pages 2277 - 2283 | - DOCKRAY, G.J., J PHYSIOL, (1999), vol. 15, pages 315 - 324 | - KOH, T.J.; CHEN, D., REGUL PEPT, (2000), pages 9337 - 44 | - BINDER, E. B. ET AL., BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2001), vol. 50, pages 856 - 872 | - FRASER, L.R.; ADEOYA-OSIGUWA, S. A., VITAM HORM, (2001), vol. 63, pages 1 - 28 | - BECK A. ET AL., J PEPT RES, (2001), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 528 - 38 | - WILK, S.; ORLOESKI, M., J. NEUROCHEM., (1983), vol. 41, page 69 | - FRIEDMAN ET AL., NEUROCHEM., (1984), vol. 42, page 237 | - ATACK ET AL., EUR. J. OF PHARM., (1991), vol. 205, pages 157 - 163 | - NISHIKATA ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1986), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 2931 - 2936 | - BAKER, A. ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEM. LETTS., (1991), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 585 - 590 | - TSURU ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 94, page 1179 | - TSURU ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 104, pages 580 - 586 | - SAITO ET AL., J. ENZ. INHIB., (1991), vol. 5, pages 51 - 75 | - ANGELASTRO, M.R., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1992), vol. 33, no. 23, pages 3265 - 3268 | - YOSHIMOTO, T. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 16, page 2942 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - SCHULZ ET AL., "Modulation of inositol 1,4,5-triphosphate concentration by prolyl endopeptidase inhibition", EUR J BIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 269, pages 5813 - 5820 | - BATEMAN, R. C. J., J NEUROSCI METHODS, (1989), vol. 30, pages 23 - 28 |