EP1723076 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MONO-DISPERSED SiO2 PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 05707303.3 | 10.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005EP01323 | Priority number, date | DE20041011110 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004011110 | [2006/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085135 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723076 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723076 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/12, C09C1/30 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/18 (KR);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C01B33/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/30 (KR);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MONODISPERSER SiO2-PARTIKEL | [2006/47] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MONO-DISPERSED SiO2 PARTICLES | [2006/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DE SiO2 MONODISPERSEES | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | IT | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | AT | 10.02.2009 | LU | 10.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GB | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE3534143 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 17-19 * page 2, lines 26-34 * * page 2, line 68 - page 4, line 15 * [A] 1-9; | [DXA]EP1036763 (MICROMOD PARTIKELTECHNOLOGIE G [DE]) [DX] 17-19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016]; examples 3-6 * [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2003002632 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-9,17-19* paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0015] - [0017] , [0048]; claim 3 * |