EP1719009 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIGHT CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/45] | LIGHT CLOSURE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
[2009/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2009/51] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microlmaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖRING, Gerhard Dorfstr. 16 07646 Schlöben / DE | 02 /
KAUFHOLD, Tobias Fuchsturmweg 15 07749 Jena / DE | [2006/45] | Application number, filing date | 05707448.6 | 17.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005EP01597 | Priority number, date | DE20041008326 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004008326 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005083491 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719009 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1719009 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02, G02B21/06 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G02B26/02 (EP,US);
G02B21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [2007/22] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LICHTVERSCHLUSSES | [2009/23] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LIGHT CLOSURE | [2009/23] | French: | PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER UN VERROU LUMINEUX | [2009/23] |
Former [2006/45] | LICHTVERSCHLUSS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN STEUERUNG | ||
Former [2006/45] | LIGHT CLOSURE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
Former [2006/45] | VERROU LUMINEUX ET PROCEDE POUR LE COMMANDER | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.04.2009 | 28.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1273955 (MUETEC AUTOMATISIERTE MIKROSKO [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0053] *; | [X]DE10132119 (CLAUS BILD UND DATENTECHNIK GM [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0022] *; | [X]US2002118430 (TUCHMAN ISRAEL [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]DE10049345 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 30 *; | [X]US6635011 (OZAWA RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 7, line 12 - line 43 * * column 8, line 15 - line 31 * * figures 1,6 * |