EP1733139 - COMMON RAIL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGEL, Hans-Christoph Bruehlstr. 3 72793 Pfullingen / DE | [2006/51] | Application number, filing date | 05707805.7 | 19.01.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005EP50224 | Priority number, date | DE20041015744 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004015744 | [2006/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095788 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733139 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733139 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/02, F02M47/02, F02M59/46 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M47/00 (EP,US);
F02M63/0007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0026 (EP,US);
F02M63/0045 (EP,US);
F02M2547/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMMON-RAIL-INJEKTOR | [2006/51] | English: | COMMON RAIL INJECTOR | [2006/51] | French: | INJECTEUR COMMON RAIL | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IE | 26.03.2008 | LT | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | PL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | IS | 26.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5152271 (MATSUMURA OSAMU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, line 11 - line 32; figure 35 *; | [A]US6420817 (RICCI-OTTATI GIULIO ANGEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, line 4 - line 31; figures 2,3a *; | [A]DE10245135 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,9,10* figure 3 *; | [A]WO03064848 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1388666 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,10 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2005010342 |