EP1720152 - SUPPORT FOR STRAIGHT WIND INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vildosola Erdociain, José Ignacio Calle Roncak, 10-2 31580 Lodosa / ES | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co., C/ Goya No. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05708089.7 | 17.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005ES00077 | Priority number, date | ES20040000407 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: ES 200400407 | [2006/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005081223 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720152 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720152 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10G5/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G10G5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTERUNG FÜR GERADE BLASINSTRUMENTE | [2006/45] | English: | SUPPORT FOR STRAIGHT WIND INSTRUMENTS | [2006/45] | French: | SUPPORT POUR INSTRUMENTS A VENT DROITS | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2006 | Translation filed | 29.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 03.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.2007 | BE | 29.08.2007 | CH | 29.08.2007 | CY | 29.08.2007 | CZ | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | LI | 29.08.2007 | LT | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | PL | 29.08.2007 | RO | 29.08.2007 | SI | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | TR | 29.08.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | IS | 29.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | LU | 17.02.2008 | IE | 18.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | HU | 01.03.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 29.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4205143 ; | [A]DE19851935 ; | [A]US4145950 (GLANTZ FRED); | [A]US4407182 (BIASINI AMERICOLE R [US]); | [A]WO03096322 (YOUN KUK WON [KR]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 09, Database accession no. 1993-068204, XP003001401 & DE4205143 C1 20000706 (KOENIG & MEYER GMBH & CO KG) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 40, Database accession no. 2000-452852, XP003001402 & DE19851935 C1 19930304 (KOENIG & MEYER GMBH & CO KG) |