24.02.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
04.11.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
10.04.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
07.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.05.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
15.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
03.11.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
28.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.09.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|