EP1727789 - PHENYLETHANOLAMINE DERIVATIVES AS BETA-2 AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
Brown, Alan Daniel c/o Pfizer Global Research & Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Alan Daniel Pfizer Global Res.and Developm Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
BUNNAGE, Mark, Edward Pfizer Global Res.and Devel. Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 03 /
GLOSSOP, Paul, Alan Pfizer Global Res.and Develop. Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 04 /
JAMES, Kim Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 05 /
LANE, Charlotte, Alice, Luise Pfizer Global Res. and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 06 /
LEWTHWAITE, Russell, Andrew Pfizer Global Res.and Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 07 /
LUNN, Graham Pfizer Global Research and Develop. Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 08 /
PRICE, David, Anthony Pfizer Global Res.and Devel. Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Pringot, Thomas, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Pringot, Thomas, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Pringot, Thomas, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / FR | ||
Former [2006/49] | Pringot, Thomas Pfizer European Patent Department 23/25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue F-75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05708731.4 | 10.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005IB00640 | Priority number, date | EP20040290725 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04290725 | US20040591790P | 27.07.2004 Original published format: US 591790 P | GB20040025064 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0425064 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005090287 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727789 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/20, C07D217/06, A61K31/165, A61K31/472 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
C07D217/06 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | 17.10.2006 | BA | 17.10.2006 | HR | 17.10.2006 | LV | 17.10.2006 | MK | 17.10.2006 | YU | 17.10.2006 | Title | German: | PHENYLETHANOLAMINDERIVATE ALS BETA-2-AGONISTEN | [2006/49] | English: | PHENYLETHANOLAMINE DERIVATIVES AS BETA-2 AGONISTS | [2006/49] | French: | DÉRIVÉS BÉTA-2 AGONISTES DE LA PHÉNYLÉTHANOLAMINE | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0006735 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,10,17-23 * example 11, first disclaimer *; | [YD]EP0236624 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [YD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03042160 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0142193 (ADVANCED MEDICINE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]WO03091204 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2562889 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2319334 (ALLEN & HANBURYS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-26 * page 3; claim - *; | [AP]EP1477167 (PFIZER LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-26 * examples, second disclaimer * | [Y] - APPERLEY G H ET AL, "Selectivity of Beta-adrenoceptor agonists and antagonists on bronchial, skeletal, vascular and cardiac muscle in the anaesthetized cat", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, (1976), vol. 57, no. 2, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 235 - 246, XP000926140 [Y] 1-26 * page 237 * | [Y] - BONNERT R V ET AL, "DUAL D2-RECEPTOR AND BETA2-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIRWAY DISEASES. 1. DISCOVERY AND BIOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF SOME 7-(2-AMINOETHYL)- 4-HYDROXYBENZOTHIAZOL-2(3H)-ONE ANALOGUES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 25, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4915 - 4917, XP000978960 [Y] 1-26 * page 4916 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980421f | [Y] - CAMPILLO N ET AL, "NOVEL BRONCHODILATORS IN THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND COPD", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (2002), vol. 1, no. 12, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 53 - 63, XP008002080 [Y] 1-26 * page 55 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.12.1.53 |