EP1721315 - PICKUP UNIT COMPRISING A STROKE LIMITER, AND DISK DRIVE UNIT PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PICKUP UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERHOFF, Waltherus, C., J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN GAAL, Fransiscus, M., A., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05708802.3 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005IB50613 | Priority number, date | EP20040100768 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04100768 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005086146 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721315 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G11B7/0933 (EP);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/121 (EP);
G11B7/0932 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNEHMEREINHEIT MIT EINEM HUBBEGRENZER UND MIT EINER SOLCHEN ABNEHMEREINHEIT AUSGESTATTETE PLATTENLAUFWERKEINHEIT | [2006/46] | English: | PICKUP UNIT COMPRISING A STROKE LIMITER, AND DISK DRIVE UNIT PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PICKUP UNIT | [2006/46] | French: | UNITE DE CAPTEUR COMPRENANT UN LIMITEUR DE CHOCS ET UNITE DE LECTEUR DE DISQUE POURVUE DE LADITE UNITE DE CAPTEUR | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 21.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0524603 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * column 9, line 4 - column 10, line 41 * * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 49 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1124223 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 5-7,17A-C,18A-B,19 * |