EP1728392 - APPLICATION CONTROLLED REMOTE STORAGE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/08] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWTON, Philip Steven c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
KELLY, Declan Patrick c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2019/08] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
NEWTON, Philip Steven c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
KELLY, Declan Patrick c/o Société Civile SPID 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/08] |
Former [2006/49] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05708960.9 | 07.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005IB50831 | Priority number, date | EP20040101133 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101133 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005091637 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728392 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728392 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/21, H04N21/23, H04N21/2747, H04N21/438, H04N21/443, H04N21/643 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/2747 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4381 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | H04N7/173, H04N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSGESTEUERTE FERNSPEICHERUNG | [2006/49] | English: | APPLICATION CONTROLLED REMOTE STORAGE. | [2006/49] | French: | MEMOIRE A DISTANCE CONTROLEE PAR UNE APPLICATION | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.09.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2005 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | IE | 07.03.2019 | LU | 07.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002184372 (ISHIKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0103] *; | [X]US2002199205 (SONAWANE NITIN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] *; | [X] - METH K Z ET AL, "FEATURES OF THE ISCSI PROTOCOL", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (200308), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 72 - 75, XP001177704 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2003.1222720 | [A] - YURKOSKI C F ET AL, "Using Inferno to execute Java on small devices", LANGUAGES, COMPILERS, AND TOOLS FOR EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. ACM SIGPLAN WORKSHOP LCTES'98. PROCEEDINGS SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, ISBN 3-540-65075-X, (1998), pages 108 - 118, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/media/3AA8LU4D7G5JPM5C6WTM/Contributions/B/E/1/N/BE1NG10HVM5961MA.pdf, (20050811), XP002340431 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BFb0057784 | [A] - SHARE IT! TEAM - WP4-GROUP, "Share it! deliverable#3: Description of example applications", (20021130), URL: http://www.hitech-projects.com/euprojects/share_it/deliverables/share-it-nob-31nov02-d3v10-final.pdf, (20050811), XP002292778 [A] 1-10 * page 64 - page 65 * | Examination | US2002059621 |