EP1703680 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE TERMINAL AND ACCESS ROUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Jun., c/o Matsushita El.Ind.CO.Ltd IP 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
ASOU, Keigo., c/o Matsushita El.Ind.CO.Lts. IP 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstraße 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05709230.6 | 07.01.2005 | [2006/38] | WO2005JP00140 | Priority number, date | JP20040002473 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004002473 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005067228 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703680 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H04W36/0011 (EP);
H04W36/0019 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/12 (KR);
H04W8/26 (KR);
H04W80/045 (KR);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | 07.07.2006 | BA | 07.07.2006 | HR | 07.07.2006 | LV | 07.07.2006 | MK | 07.07.2006 | YU | 07.07.2006 | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND ZUGANGS-ROUTER | [2006/38] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE TERMINAL AND ACCESS ROUTER | [2006/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL MOBILE ET ROUTEUR D'ACCES | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | Translation filed | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 15.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002271376 (SONY CORP); |