EP1770546 - ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Takashi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 02 /
Takenaka, Masahiko, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05709271.0 | 24.01.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005JP00827 | Priority number, date | JP20040210999 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004210999 | [2007/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006008847 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770546 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/21, G06F17/24 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US);
G06F40/197 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/43] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES DOKUMENTVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/14] | English: | ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2007/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONIQUES | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | Translation filed | 20.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 23.09.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 06.10.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2018 | 17.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/25] | 15.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003114884 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2003216601 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2004085354 (MASSAND DEEPAK [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] ** paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * | International search | [Y]JP2003216601 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003228560 (FUJITSU LTD) | [Y] - MIYAZAKI K ET AL, "Kaiji Joken o Seigyo Kano na Denshi Bunsho Suminuri Gijutsu.", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS., (20040127), pages 515 - 520, XP002996603 | Examination | US5465299 | - Ron Rivest ET AL, "Lectures Notes 3 & 4 : Hashing", MIT - 6.857 Lecture References - Fall 2002: Lecture 03 (Th 9/12/2002): Hashing, (20020917), URL: web.mit.edu/6.857/OldStuff/Fall02/handouts/L03-hashing.ps, (20180712), XP055491988 | by applicant | JP2003114884 | JP2003216601 |