EP1714294 - NONVOLATILE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kiyoshi c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO. LTD. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
KATO, K., SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO. LTD. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2006/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05710153.7 | 04.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005JP02108 | Priority number, date | JP20040033081 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004033081 | JP20040033075 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004033075 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005076281 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714294 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714294 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C16/22 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G11C16/22 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (KR);
G11C16/30 (KR);
G11C29/702 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | G11C16/04, G11C16/22, G06K19/07, G11C17/14 | ||
Former IPC [2007/22] | G11C16/04, G11C16/22, G06K19/07 | ||
Former IPC [2006/43] | G11C16/22, G06F12/14, G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2016/16] |
Former [2007/20] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGER SPEICHER | [2006/43] | English: | NONVOLATILE MEMORY | [2006/43] | French: | MÉMOIRE NON VOLATILE | [2016/03] |
Former [2006/43] | MEMOIRE NON VOLATILE | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | [2016/49] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0293339 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]); | [XA]EP0337393 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]US5029131 (VANCU RADU M [US]); | [A]EP0448118 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]JPH10154293 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]US6141257 (ROCHARD LAURENT [FR]); | [A]JP2002203217 (DENSO CORP); | [A]US2002131299 (YAMAZOE TAKANORI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH10116493 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH10228422 (MOTOROLA JAPAN); | [A]JP2000207506 (TOKIN CORP); | [A]JP2001283594 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2002251888 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2002316724 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2003132690 (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC) | Examination | US5789970 | by applicant | EP0337393 | US5789970 |