EP1717205 - METHOD OF LIQUID DETOXIFICATION AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Kazuki, YOKOHAMA Research&Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 02 /
FUJISE, Kazuhiko, YOKOHAMA Research &Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 03 /
TABATA, Masayuki YOKOHAMA Research & Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 04 /
SUGATA, Kiyoshi, YOKOHAMA Research & Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 05 /
UEDA, Ryouhei, YOKOHAMA Research & Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1, Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 06 /
UEDA, Takashi, YOKOHAMA Research & Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 1-8-1, Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | 07 /
OKADA, Hirokazu, YOKOHAMA Dockyard&Machinery Works MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD., 12, Nishiki-cho Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2318715 / JP | 08 /
OOMURA, Tomoaki, YOKOHAMA Research & Develop. Ctr. MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD., 1-8-1, Sachiura Kanazawa, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 2368515 / JP | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.r.l Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05710363.2 | 10.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005JP02515 | Priority number, date | JP20040037273 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004037273 | JP20040135389 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004135389 | JP20040170514 | 08.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004170514 | [2006/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077833 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717205 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/50, B63B13/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/34, C02F1/38, C02F1/46, C02F1/70, C02F1/76, C02F9/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B63J4/002 (EP,KR,US);
B63B35/44 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/28 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/34 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/38 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2007/21] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETOXIFIKATION VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2006/44] | English: | METHOD OF LIQUID DETOXIFICATION AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2006/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETOXICATION DE LIQUIDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CELUI-CI | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2006 | Translation filed | 22.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 29.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS63100995 (EBARA INFILCO, et al); | [Y]JP2001170638 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH04322788 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2003200156 (KAIYO KAIHATSU GIJUTSU KENKYUS); | [Y]JPH0691283 (HITACHI KIDEN KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2004025040 (HITACHI LTD) |