EP1734268 - OBLIQUE CONTACT BALL BEARING AND BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Toshihiro c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
OGINO, Kiyoshi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Steinmeister, Helmut Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 05710420.0 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005JP02588 | Priority number, date | JP20040044581 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004044581 | [2006/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080808 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734268 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/18, F16C33/66, F16H57/02, F16H57/04, F16C19/06, F16C19/08, F16C19/16, F16C19/49, F16C43/06 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
F16C19/182 (EP,US);
F16C19/548 (EP,US);
F16C33/6651 (EP,US);
F16C33/6688 (EP,US);
F16H57/021 (EP,US);
F16H57/037 (EP,US);
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
F16C2229/00 (EP,US);
F16C2240/80 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US);
F16H2048/423 (EP,US);
F16H48/06 (EP,US);
F16H48/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | F16C19/18, C10M129/40, C10M129/42, C10M129/58, C10M129/76, C10M133/08, C10M135/10, C10M137/02, C10M169/04, F16C33/66, F16H57/02, // C10N20/02, C10N30/12, C10N40/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRÄGKUGELLAGER UND LAGERVORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSTÜTZEN EINER RITZELWELLE | [2006/51] | English: | OBLIQUE CONTACT BALL BEARING AND BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT | [2006/51] | French: | ROULEMENT BILLES CONTACT OBLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE ROULEMENT POUR SOUTENIR UN ARBRE PIGNON | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | Translation filed | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3695391 (MUNNICH HERMANN, et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-12; | [XY]US4464275 (YASUI HIROYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * [Y] 5-12; | [XY]US6086261 (NAKAGAWA KAZUFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 27 - line 43; figure 1 * * column 3, line 40 - line 50 * [Y] 5-12; | [XY]WO02097289 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 1, lines 20-22; table 1 * [Y] 5-8,11,12; | [YD]JP2003156128 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [YD] 5-12 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2003176832 (NSK LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5-12; | WO03071146 [ ] (NSK LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003314541 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [Y] 5-12 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1484519 (NSK LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-5,8,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0039]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2003314541 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP2003176832 (NSK LTD); | [A]JP2004043718 (NSK LTD); | [A]JPH11201172 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) | [Y] - WATABAYASHI E. ET AL, "JIS Tsukaikata Series Korogari Jikuuke no Erabikata Tsukaikata.", (19761201), pages 212 - 213 | [Y] - "The Toyo Bearing Mfg.", NTN, BEARING CATALOG, (1960), no. 600, pages 89 - 91 |