EP1862661 - MAGNETIC APPARATUS COMPRISING VANES AND GROOVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUPPLY FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fernández de la Torre, Alfonso Avenida Centenario N[deg]67-local-6 Colonia Merced Gómez C.P. 01600 México DF / MX | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/49] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.A., Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05710876.3 | 03.03.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005MX00016 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093400 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862661 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M27/04 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
F02M27/045 (EP,US);
F02M37/0064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLÜGELN UND NUTEN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON SPEISEKRAFTSTOFF | [2007/49] | English: | MAGNETIC APPARATUS COMPRISING VANES AND GROOVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUPPLY FUELS | [2007/49] | French: | APPAREIL A AUBES ET RAINURES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES COMBUSTIBLES D'ALIMENTATION | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2007 | Translation filed | 21.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0073077 (SBH TRADING SA [CH]); | [A]US2502139 (GUSTAV FRANK); | [A]EP1354858 (TSUNEMATSU TOSHIAKI [JP]); | [A]RU2082897 (INST PRIRODOPOLZOVANIYA NDI LT [SU]); | [A]EP1408227 (DUKIC DAY DREAM S R L [IT]) |