EP1733092 - USE OF PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE DERIVED FROM KERATIN-CONTAINING MATERIAL IN THE WET-END OF A PAPERMAKING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast -natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLAGHEK, Theodoor, Maximiliaan Schansweg 35 NL-3042 HT Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN WANDELEN, Mario, Tarcisius, Raymundus Rooseveltlaan 14 NL-3705 PG Zeist / NL | 03 /
DROST, Willem, Cornelis Van Reenenweg 94 NL-3702 SM Zeist / NL | 04 /
LO CASCIO, Dario, Maria, Rosario Boomvalk 17 NL-1191 SB Ouderkerk aan de Amstel / NL | 05 /
VAN WILLIGE, Remco, Willem, Godefridus Poortersveld 727 NL-7327 AS Apeldoorn / NL | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/51] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05710899.5 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005NL00120 | Priority number, date | EP20040075539 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04075539 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080680 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733092 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733092 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/22, D21H21/18 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
D21H17/22 (EP,US);
D21H21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | 04.09.2006 | BA | 04.09.2006 | HR | 04.09.2006 | LV | 04.09.2006 | MK | 04.09.2006 | YU | 04.09.2006 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PROTEINHYDROLYSAT AUS KERATINHALTIGEM MATERIAL IN DER NASSPARTIE EINER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2006/51] | English: | USE OF PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE DERIVED FROM KERATIN-CONTAINING MATERIAL IN THE WET-END OF A PAPERMAKING PROCESS | [2006/51] | French: | UTILISATION D'HYDROLYSAT DE PROTEINES DERIVE DE MATERIELS CONTENANT DE LA KERATINE COMME ADJUVANT DANS DES PRODUITS DE PAPIERS | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2005 | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | IT | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | IE | 18.02.2012 | LU | 18.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
LU | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 13.07.2011 | |
IS | 13.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06192433 ; | [A]JP2003238330 ; | [A]JPH06191967 ; | [A]JPS5975971 ; | [Y]US3207613 (R.E. MERRILL ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 21 - line 55 * * column 3, line 69 - line 72 * * column 6, line 5 - line 37 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 12 *; | [X]US5810970 (HUGHES KENNETH E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * example - *; | [XY]WO9913861 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,8-10,13 * page 14, line 30 - page 16, line 11 * * page 48, line 11 - page 49, line 15 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1-14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941019), vol. 018, no. 547, Database accession no. (C - 1262), & JP06192433 A 19940712 (KYOEISHA CHEM CO LTD; others: 02) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003238330 A 20030827 (SEIWA KASEI:KK) [A] 1-5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941017), vol. 018, no. 542, Database accession no. (C - 1261), & JP06191967 A 19940712 (AROMA KAGAKU KIKAI KOGYO:KK; others: 01) [A] 6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840816), vol. 008, no. 178, Database accession no. (C - 238), & JP59075971 A 19840428 (KOUYOU SANGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |