EP1723257 - CLASSIFICATION, DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF ACUTE MYELOID LEUKEMIA BY GENE EXPRESSION PROFILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [2019/02] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GD Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Erasmus Universiteit Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORHOUSE, Michael, John Zwaanshaals 245 A NL-3035 KE Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
VALK, Petrus, Jacobus, Maria Wout van Heusdensingel 105 NL-3059 TD Rotterdam / NL | 03 /
DELWEL, Hendrik, Rudolf Leeuwendaal 10 NL-3273 XD Westmaas / NL | 04 /
LOWENBERG, Bob Vijverweg 38 NL-3062 JP Rotterdam / NL | 05 /
VAN DER SPEK, Petrus, Johannes Hulsbos 5 B-2275 Lille / BE | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/02] |
Former [2009/23] | Habets, Winand Life Science Patents PO Box 5096 6130 PB Sittard / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/47] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05710909.2 | 23.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005NL00134 | Priority number, date | EP20040075570 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04075570 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005080601 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723257 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723257 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/20, C12Q1/6886 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | G06F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/47] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 11.09.2006 | BA | 11.09.2006 | HR | 11.09.2006 | LV | 11.09.2006 | MK | 11.09.2006 | YU | 11.09.2006 | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNG, DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON AKUTER MYEOLIDER LEUKÄMIE ÜBER ERSTELLUNG VON GENEXPRESSIONSPROFILEN | [2006/47] | English: | CLASSIFICATION, DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF ACUTE MYELOID LEUKEMIA BY GENE EXPRESSION PROFILING | [2006/47] | French: | CLASSIFICATION, DIAGNOSTIC, ET PRONOSTIC DE LEUCEMIE MYELOIDE PAR PROFILAGE DE L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2005 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | IE | 23.02.2019 | LU | 23.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1043676 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0047] , [0068] * * figures 1A-C,3B,5C *; | [DX] - TIBSHIRANI R ET AL, "Diagnosis of multiple cancer types by shrunken centroids of gene expression", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020514), vol. 99, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6567 - 6572, XP002988576 [DX] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.082099299 | [X] - RINGNER M ET AL, "ANALYZING ARRAY DATA USING SUPERVISED METHODS", PHARMACOGENOMICS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (200205), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1462-2416, pages 403 - 415, XP008067366 [X] 1-9 * page 403 - page 407 * * tables 1,2 * | [PX] - VALK P J M ET AL, "Prognostically useful gene-expression profiles in acute myeloid leukemia", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, WALTHAM, MA, US, (20040415), vol. 350, no. 16, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1617 - 1628, XP002361722 [PX] 1-9 * page 1619, column L, line 18 - page 1621, column L, line 51 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa040465 | [A] - TUSHER V G ET AL, "Significance analysis of microarrays applied to the ionizing radition response", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010424), vol. 98, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5116 - 5121, XP002967440 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.091062498 | Examination | WO03102235 |