EP1844175 - A THERMAL SPRAYING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Aero Corporation S-461 81 Trollhättan / SE | For all designated states Högskolan Trollhattan/Uddevalla Inst. for Teknik, Box 957 461 29 Trollhattan / SE | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGREN, Jan Furulundsvägen 12 S-461 44 Trollhättan / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Jimmy Kronogårdsgatan 22 S-461 53 Trollhättan / SE | 03 /
BJÖRKLUND, Stefan Resedavägen 5 S-461 44 Trollhättan / SE | 04 /
CHOQUET, Isabelle Tomteliden 1 S-461 39 Trollhättan / SE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05711016.5 | 26.01.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005SE00102 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080870 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844175 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844175 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, B05B7/20, H05H1/42 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H05H1/42 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (EP,US);
C23C4/129 (EP,US);
B05B7/10 (EP,US);
B05B7/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM THERMISCHEN SPRITZEN | [2007/42] | English: | A THERMAL SPRAYING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2007/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION THERMIQUE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 04.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | IE | 26.01.2009 | LU | 26.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
LU | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
LU | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3601502 (CASTOLIN GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0323185 (AMOCO CORP [US]); | [X]GB2281488 (PLASMA TECHNIK LTD [GB]); | [A]US5858470 (BERNECKI THOMAS F [US], et al); | [X]EP1075167 (SULZER METCO AG [CH]); | [A]DE10253794 ; | [A]US2004129222 (NYLEN PER [SE], et al) |