EP1711663 - WATER SAVING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVL Engineering PTE LTD. BLK 5041 Ang Mo Kio Ind. Pk. 2, 01-495 Singapore 569544 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states JVL Engineering PTE LTD. BLK 5041 Ang Mo Kio Ind. Pk. 2, 01-495 Singapore 569544 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOONG, Meng 63 Gerald Drive Singapore 799010 / SG | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Hannke, Christian HANNKE & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05711187.4 | 07.02.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005SG00028 | Priority number, date | SG20040000564 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: SG 200400564 | AU20040906200 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: AU 2004906200 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075754 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711663 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/08 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
E03C1/08 (EP,US);
E03C2001/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | E03B7/07, E03B7/09, E03C1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSPARVORRICHTUNG | [2006/42] | English: | WATER SAVING DEVICE | [2006/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES ECONOMIES D'EAU | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4537360 (BOCK ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure - * * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 11 ** column 5, line 8 - line 13 *; | [XA]US4657186 (SHAPIRO EUGENE B [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * figure - * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 37 * [A] 5; | [Y]US5114072 (BARHYDT SR DIRCK [US]) [Y] 5 * figure 3 *; | [X]US5242119 (JARIYASUNANT VICHAI [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figure - * * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 36 *; | [XY]WO9819797 (WATER MANAGEMENT EQUIPMENT LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1-6,11-21 * * page 28, line 5 - line 11 * [Y] 5 | International search | [A]JPH1025779 ; | [A]DE19614302 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [A]GB2337099 (TAPMAGIC LTD [GB]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 14, Database accession no. 1998-154457, XP003010389 & JPH1025779 A 19980127 (INAX KK) | by applicant | WO9819797 |