EP1711517 - MUTANT SODIUM CHANNEL NAv1.7 AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive Suite 110 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 110 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPPERT, Mark F. 1466 Westminster Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Nanda A. 101 Timberlakes Heber City, UT 84032 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2006/42] | 01 /
LEPPERT, Mark, F. 1466 Westminster Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | ||
02 /
SINGH, Nanda, A. 101 Timberlakes Heber City, UT 84032 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Helbing, Jörg Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05711840.8 | 21.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005US02059 | Priority number, date | US20040538149P | 21.01.2004 Original published format: US 538149 P | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005069969 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1711517 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07K14/00 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | C07K14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTER NATRIUMKANAL NAv1.7 UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE VERFAHREN | [2006/42] | English: | MUTANT SODIUM CHANNEL NAv1.7 AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2006/42] | French: | CANAL SODIQUE NAv1.7 MUTANT ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 16.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02083945 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 12 * Methods of identifying compounds which inhibits a voltage-gated Na+ channel;; claim 31 *; | [Y]US2003194751 (DUBIN ADRIENNE [US], et al) [Y] 12 * Method for identifying modulators of Nav1.3 and Nav1.7 ion channels;; claim 9 *; | [X] - PFEIFFER ET AL., "A locus for febrile seizures (FEB3) maps to chromosome 2q23-24", ANN. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 46, pages 671 - 678, XP002454582 [X] 1,2,7-21,39-41 * abstract * * page 676, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1531-8249(199910)46:4<671::AID-ANA20>3.0.CO;2-5 | [X] - SORENSEN ET AL., "Nav1.7/Pn1 sodium channel upregulation and accumulation at demyelinated sites in painful human tooth pulp", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANER, (200311), page 175.13, XP008084656 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | [X] - HONG ET AL., "Painful diabetic neuropathy: evidence for altered expression and function of sodium channels", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, (200311), vol. 2003, page 657.5, XP008084657 [X] 1,10 * abstract * | [XY] - "Variation associated with SCN9A", NCBI (SNP), (20030807), Database accession no. rs7589743, XP002454590 [X] 13-21,39-41 * the whole document * [Y] 12 | [XY] - "Variation associated with SCN9A", NCBI (SNP), (20030807), Database accession no. rs6432901, XP002454591 [X] 13-21,39-41 * the whole document * [Y] 12 | [X] - TOLEDO-ARAL JUAN J ET AL, "Identification of PN1, a predominant voltage-dependent sodium channel expressed principally in peripheral neurons", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1527 - 1532, XP002454583 [X] 13-21,39-41 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1527 | [A] - ESCAYG ANDREW ET AL, "A novel SCN1A mutation associated with generalized epilepsy with febrile seizures plus: And prevalence of variants in patients with epilepsy", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (200104), vol. 68, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 866 - 873, XP002271974 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/319524 | International search | [A]US6673549 (FURNESS L MICHAEL [GB], et al) | Examination | - "PCR primer used to amplify a fragment of the FRI locus.", GENESEQ, (20001204), Database accession no. AAA63702, URL: EBI | - "RPCI-23-479K6.TJ RPCI-23 Mus musculus genomic clone RPCI-23-479K6, genomic survey sequence.", EMBL, (20000514), Database accession no. AZ123090, URL: EBI | - "Transcription factor B1, mitochondrial [Mus musculus]", NCBI PROTEIN, (20031221), Database accession no. NP_666186; version NP_666186.1 GI:22122569 | by applicant | US3610795 | US4342566 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4736866 | US4816567 | WO8907136 | US4868116 | US4897355 | WO9002806 | US4965188 | US4980286 | EP0454461 | WO9320227 | WO9322461 | WO9429348 | US5445934 | EP0684315 | WO9535505 | US5565332 | US5721367 | US5804440 | US5837243 | US5939598 | US6041253 | US6096441 | US6130364 | US6180377 | WO0148244 | US6261834 | US6331311 | - KRANER ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1985), vol. 260, pages 6341 - 6347 | - TANAKA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1983), vol. 258, page 75197526 | - HARTSHOME ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1984), vol. 259, pages 1667 - 1675 | - CATTERALL, PHYSIOL REV, (1992), vol. 72, pages S14 - S48 | - ANDERSON ET AL., PHYSIOL REV, (1992), vol. 72, pages S89 - S158 | - CATTERALL, ANN REV BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 64, pages 493 - 531 | - Molecular Biology of the Cell, GARLAND PUB., (1994), pages 534 - 535 | - AGNEW ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 2606 - 2610 | - AGNEW ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMM, (1980), vol. 92, pages 860 - 866 | - CATTERALL, ANN REV BIOCHEM, (1986), vol. 55, pages 953 - 985 | - GOLDIN ET AL., NEURON, (2000), vol. 28, pages 365 - 368 | - PFEIFFER ET AL., ANN. NEUROL, (1999), vol. 46, pages 671 - 678 | - LETSINGER, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - RILEY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, pages 2887 - 2890 | - DELAHUNTY ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (1996), vol. 58, pages 1239 - 1246 | - NIKIFOROV ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4167 - 4175 | - PASTINEN ET AL., GENOME RES, (1997), vol. 7, pages 606 - 614 | - NIKIFOROV ET AL., PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1994), vol. 3, pages 285 - 291 | - IVES ET AL., "Proc SPIE-Int Soc Opt Eng 2680", ULTRASENSITIVE BIOCHEMICAL DIAGNOSTICS, (1996), pages 258 - 269 | - RAMSAY, NAT BIOTECH, (1998), vol. 16, page 4044 | - HACIA ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 14, pages 441 - 447 | - LOCKHART ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680 | - DE RISI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 14, page 457460 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 3, pages 403 - 410 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC NAD ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - BRUTLAG ET AL., COMPT APPL BIOSCI, (1990), vol. 6, pages 237 - 245 | - WOLFF ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468 | - WOLFF, NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 815 - 818 | - RAM ET AL., CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 83 - 88 | - Microbiology, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (1985), pages 229 - 232 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - BERKNER, J VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 61, pages 1213 - 1220 | - MASSIE ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1986), vol. 6, pages 2872 - 2883 | - HAJ-AHMAD ET AL., J VIROLOGY, (1986), vol. 57, pages 267 - 274 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., J VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 61, pages 1226 - 1239 | - ZHANG, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 15, pages 868 - 872 | - MORSY, J CLIN INVEST, (1993), vol. 92, pages 1580 - 1586 | - KIRSHENBAUM, J CLIN INVEST, (1993), vol. 92, pages 381 - 387 | - ROESSLER, J CLIN INVEST, (1993), vol. 92, pages 1085 - 1092 | - MOULLIER, NATURE GENETICS, (1993), vol. 4, pages 154 - 159 | - LA SALLE, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 988 - 990 | - GOMEZ-FOIX, J BIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 25129 - 25134 | - RICH, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 461 - 476 | - ZABNER, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, pages 75 - 83 | - GUZMAN, CIRCULATION RES, (1993), vol. 73, pages 1201 - 1207 | - BOUT, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 3 - 10 | - ZABNER, CELL, (1993), vol. 75, pages 207 - 216 | - CAILLAUD, EUR. J. NEUROSCIENCE, (1993), vol. 5, pages 1287 - 1291 | - RAGOT, J GEN VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 74, pages 501 - 507 | - CHARDONNET ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1970), vol. 40, pages 462 - 477 | - BROWN ET AL., J VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 12, pages 386 - 396 | - SVENSSON ET AL., J VIROLOGY, (1985), vol. 55, pages 442 - 449 | - SETH ET AL., J VIROL, (1985), vol. 51, pages 650 - 655 | - SETH ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1984), vol. 4, pages 1528 - 1533 | - VARGA ET AL., J VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 65, pages 6061 - 6070 | - WICKHAM ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 309 - 319 | - SUN ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 8, pages 33 - 41 | - COTTER ET AL., CURR OPIN MOL THER, (1999), vol. 5, pages 633 - 644 | - BRIGHAM ET AL., AM J RESP CELL MOL BIOL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 95 - 100 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - SENTER ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1991), vol. 2, pages 447 - 451 | - BAGSHAWE ET AL., BR J CANCER, (1998), vol. 60, page 275281 | - BAGSHAWE ET AL., BR J CANCER, (1988), vol. 58, pages 700 - 703 | - SENTER ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1993), vol. 4, pages 3 - 9 | - BATTELLI ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (1992), vol. 35, pages 421 - 425 | - PIETERSZ ET AL., IMMUNOLOG REV, (1992), vol. 129, pages 57 - 80 | - ROFFLER ET AL., BIOCHEM PHANNACOL, (1991), vol. 42, pages 2062 - 2065 | - HUGHES ET AL., CANCER RES, (1989), vol. 49, pages 6214 - 6220 | - LITZINGER ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1992), vol. 1104, pages 179 - 187 | - BROWN ET AL., DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 10, pages 399 - 409 | - FIERS ET AL., NATURE, (1978), vol. 273, page 113 | - GREENWAY ET AL., GENE, (1982), vol. 18, pages 355 - 360 | - LAIMINS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 993 | - LUSKY ET AL., MOL CELL BIO, (1983), vol. 3, page 1108 | - BANERJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, page 729 | - OSBOME ET AL., MOL CELL BIO, (1984), vol. 4, page 1293 | - SOUTHERN ET AL., J MOLEC APPL GENET, (1982), vol. 1, page 327 | - MULLIGAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 209, page 1422 | - SUGDEN ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1985), vol. 5, pages 410 - 413 | - SMITH, WATERMAN, ADV APPL MATH, (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J MOL BIOL, (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ABRAHMSEN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, page 4151 | - DAWSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 776 - 779 | - BAGGIOLINI ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1992), vol. 307, pages 97 - 101 | - CLARK-LEWIS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, page 16075 | - CLARK-LEWIS ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, page 3128 | - RAJARATHNAM ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 6623 - 30 | - SCHNOLZER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, page 221 | - MILTON ET AL., Techniques in Protein Chemistry IV., ACADEMIC PRESS, (1992), pages 257 - 267 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - ZOLLER, J GURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1992), vol. 3, pages 348 - 354 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77 | - BOEMER ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95 | - HOOGENBOOM, J MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 222, page 581 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SD USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2551 - 2555 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BROGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - PRESTA, CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - QONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 7851 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, page 908 | - ANNEGERS ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1987), vol. 316, pages 493 - 498 | - PEIFFER ET AL., ANN NEUROL, (1999), vol. 46, pages 671 - 678 | - CATTERALL, NEURON, (2000), vol. 26, pages 13 - 25 | - SANGAMESWARAN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 14805 - 14809 | - FELTS ET AL., BRAIN RES MOL BRAIN RES, (1997), vol. 45, pages 71 - 82 | - TOLEDO-ARAL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 1527 - 1532 | - GOLDIN ET AL., ANNU REV PHYSIOL, (2001), vol. 63, pages 871 - 894 | - SINGH ET AL., ARM NEUROL, (1999), vol. 45, pages 75 - 81 | - SUGAWARA ET AL., PROC NAD ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 6384 - 6389 | - WALLACE ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (2001), vol. 68, pages 859 - 865 | - ESCAYG ET AL., NAT GENET, (2000), vol. 24, pages 343 - 345 | - NABBOUT ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2003), vol. 60, pages 1961 - 1967 | - FUJIWARA ET AL., BRAIN, (2003), vol. 126, pages 531 - 546 | - CLAES ET AL., HUM MUTAT, (2003), vol. 21, pages 615 - 621 | - LOSSIN ET AL., J NEUROSCI, (2003), vol. 23, no. 36, pages 11289 - 11295 |