EP1706216 - METHODS FOR COATING AND IMPREGNATING MEDICAL DEVICES WITH ANTISEPTIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin Texas 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAD, Issam 4207 Clearwater Court Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | 02 /
HANNA, Hend, A. Herengracht 393 1016 BC Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
CHAIBAN, Gassan 7514 Almond Springs Drive Houston, TX 77095 / US | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Dehmel, Albrecht Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05711842.4 | 19.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005US02062 | Priority number, date | US20040538284P | 20.01.2004 Original published format: US 538284 P | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005072281 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1706216 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/00 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
D06P1/90 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
D06P1/924 (EP,US);
D06P1/928 (EP,US);
A61L2300/202 (EP,US);
A61L2300/204 (EP,US);
A61L2300/206 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN UND IMPRÄGNIEREN VON MEDIZINISCHEN GERÄTEN MIT ANTISEPTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2006/40] | English: | METHODS FOR COATING AND IMPREGNATING MEDICAL DEVICES WITH ANTISEPTIC COMPOSITIONS | [2006/40] | French: | PROCEDES DE REVETEMENT ET D'IMPREGNATION DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX AU MOYEN DE COMPOSITIONS ANTISEPTIQUES | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 04.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03077866 (ASH MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO2005000189 (RIDER DEAN LOLLER [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * Abstract; par. bridging pages 40 and 41. * | International search | [X]US2003078242 (RAAD ISSAM [US], et al); | [XP]US2004254545 (RIDER DEAN LOLLER [US], et al) |