EP1718525 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OPERATING AIRCRAFT LANDING GEARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDAHL, Gary, M. 8200 116th Avenue SE. Newcastle, WA 98056 / US | 02 /
TROTTER, Steven, J. 12812 111th Ave. N.E. Kirkland, WA 98034-6305 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
LINDAHL, Gary, M. 8200 116th Avenue SE. Newcastle, WA 98056 / US | ||
02 /
TROTTER, Steven, J. 12812 11th Ave. N.E. Kirkland, WA 98034-6305 / US | |||
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
LINDAHL, Gary, M. 8200 116th Avenue SE. Newcastle, WA 98056 / US | ||
02 /
TROTTER, Steven, J. 12812 11th Ave. N.E. Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05712246.7 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US02728 | Priority number, date | US20040774981 | 09.02.2004 Original published format: US 774981 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077757 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718525 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718525 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/18, B64C25/16 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
B64C25/18 (EP,US);
B64C25/16 (EP,US);
B64C25/22 (EP,US);
B64C25/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BETÄTIGUNG VON FLUGZEUGFAHRWERKEN | [2006/45] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OPERATING AIRCRAFT LANDING GEARS | [2006/45] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES D'ACTIONNEMENT DE TRAINS D'ATTERRISSAGE D'AVIONS | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | LT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | IS | 16.11.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | IE | 28.01.2009 | LU | 28.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
LU | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
LU | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB552557 (PHILLIPS & POWIS AIRCRAFT LTD, et al) [A] 1,7,19,22,26,32,37,41 * page 1, line 10 - line 24 *; | [A]GB561456 (DOWTY EQUIPMENT LTD, et al) [A] 1,7,19,22,26,32,37,41 * page 1, line 11 - line 27 *; | [A]EP0564772 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1,7,19,22,26,32,37,41* figure 2 *; | [A]GB2373772 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7,19,22,26,32,37,41 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - line 16 * * page 5, line 1 - line 16 * * claim 6 * * figure 1 * |