15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
22.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
20.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.08.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.10.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
02.10.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.06.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.02.2008 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
06.04.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
13.10.2006 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
06.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
04.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|