Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007281323 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58833905 | 03.02.2005 | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | WO2005US03211 | 03.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5155564B | Global Dossier | 06.03.2013 | B2 | JP2007523644 | 23.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | WO2005US03211 | 03.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2280282 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05712595 | 03.02.2005 | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1718967 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2013 | B1 | EP1718967 | 05.03.2008 | A4 | EP1718967 | 08.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | WO2005US03211 | 03.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1718967T | 03.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | WO2005US03211 | 03.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2416344T | 31.07.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | WO2005US03211 | 03.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005074604 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A3 | WO2005074604 | 18.08.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011177182 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US54158304 | 03.02.2004 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 02.11.2010 | EP2280282 |