EP1750545 - PRODUCT SECUREMENT AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTC INDUSTRIES, INC. 2800 Golf Road Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARDY, Stephen, N. 383 Barbara Circle Wadsworth, Illinois 44281 / US | 02 /
GOLD, Adam 1710 Central Avenue Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | 03 /
WARD, John 320 Whitney Drive Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | 04 /
SYVUK, Max, E., Sr. 14581 Concord Trail Middleburg Heights, Ohio 44130 / US | 05 /
SWAFFORD, John, W. 1081 Foxworth Boulevard Lombard, Illinois 60148 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/07] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05712755.7 | 02.02.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US03423 | Priority number, date | US20040541804P | 03.02.2004 Original published format: US 541804 P | US20050047915 | 01.02.2005 Original published format: US 47915 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005074635 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750545 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750545 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47B43/00, E05B73/00, A47F3/00, G08B13/08, // A47F1/12 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A47F3/002 (EP,US);
A47B47/00 (KR);
A47B57/00 (KR);
A47F1/125 (EP,US);
G08B13/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A47B43/00, E05B73/00, A47F3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/07] | A47B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 30.08.2006 | BA | 30.08.2006 | HR | 30.08.2006 | LV | 30.08.2006 | MK | 30.08.2006 | YU | 30.08.2006 | Title | German: | PRODUKTSICHERUNGS- UND -VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/07] | English: | PRODUCT SECUREMENT AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2007/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURISATION ET DE GESTION DE PRODUITS | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 19.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2005 | AT | 20.05.2015 | BE | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | IE | 02.02.2016 | LU | 02.02.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.02.2005 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5392025 (FIGH JACK N [US], et al) [Y] 2,6-9 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 3 *; | [XY]EP0979628 (KESSEBOEHMER DRAHT & METALL H [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,14,20,48 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6-9; | [X]US6142317 (MERL MILTON J [US]) [X] 57,58* figure - * | International search | [X]US6142317 (MERL MILTON J [US]); | [Y]US2005279722 (ALI ALA [US]) | Examination | US3923159 | DE29510232U | WO0030503 | by applicant | US4830201 | US6041720 | WO02091885 | WO2005074616 | US20040772134 | US20040772010 |