|
23.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.02.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
29 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
33 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
22 |