EP1758461 - WHEAT PROTEIN ISOLATES AND THEIR MODIFIED FORMS AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGP Ingredients Inc 1300 Main Street Atchison, KS 66002-0130 / US | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANINGAT, Clodualdo C. 15995 Country Lane West Platte City, MO 64079 / US | 02 /
NIE, Li 6241 Northlake Drive, Parkville Missouri 64152 / US | 03 /
BASSI, Sukh, D. 1502 Hilcrest Court Atchison, KS 66002 / US | 04 /
KELLEY, George, A. 1713 Linden Lane Atchison, KS 66002 / US | 05 /
TROMPETER, Edward, E. 9824 Highway K7 Atchison, KS 66002 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
MANINGAT, Clodualdo C. 15995 Country Lane West Platte City, MO 64079 / US | ||
02 /
NIE, Li 6627 N. Camden Avenue Kansas City, MO 64151 / US | |||
03 /
BASSI, Sukh, D. 1502 Hilcrest Court Atchison, KS 66002 / US | |||
04 /
KELLEY, George, A. 1713 Linden Lane Atchison, KS 66002 / US | |||
05 /
TROMPETER, Edward, E. 9824 Highway K7 Atchison, KS 66002 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05713663.2 | 16.02.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005US04925 | Priority number, date | US20040583051P | 25.06.2004 Original published format: US 583051 P | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011911 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758461 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758461 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/12 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A23J1/12 (EP,US);
A23J3/18 (EP,US);
A23J3/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEIZENEIWEISS-ISOLATE, IHRE VARIANTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2007/10] | English: | WHEAT PROTEIN ISOLATES AND THEIR MODIFIED FORMS AND METHODS OF MAKING | [2007/10] | French: | ISOLATS DE PROTÉINE DE BLÉ ET LEURS FORMES MODIFIÉES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 06.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2005 | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | IT | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/32] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB708806 (HONORARY ADVISORY COUNCIL SCI) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2891045 (MONTGOMERY DUNCAN B, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0077821 (NEW ZEALAND MILK PRODUCTS INC) [A] 1-11 * examples 2,3; claim - ** column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 2 * |