EP1715872 - IMPROVED THERAPY USING A COMBINATION OF RALOXIFENE AND ALENDRONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LERNER, Itzhak, E. 18 Yahalom Street 49404 Petach Tikva / IL | 02 /
FLASHNER-BARAK, Moshe Hefetz Mordechai 15 49313 Petach Tiqva / IL | [2007/07] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
LERNER, Itzhak, E. Wolfson 32 49541 Petah Tiqva / IL | ||
02 /
FLASHNER-BARAK, Moshe Hefetz Mordechai 15 49313 Petach Tiqva / IL | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05713811.7 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005US05267 | Priority number, date | US20040545975P | 19.02.2004 Original published format: US 545975 P | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005079811 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715872 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/663, A61K31/4535, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61K9/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4535, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/663, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/66, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | 11.08.2006 | BA | 11.08.2006 | HR | 11.08.2006 | LV | 11.08.2006 | MK | 11.08.2006 | YU | 11.08.2006 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE THERAPIE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINATION VON RALOXIFEN UND ALENDRONAT | [2006/44] | English: | IMPROVED THERAPY USING A COMBINATION OF RALOXIFENE AND ALENDRONATE | [2006/44] | French: | THERAPIE AMELIOREE UTILISANT UNE COMBINAISON DE RALOXIFENE ET D'ALENDRONATE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | NZ272608 [ ] (LILLY CO ELI); | [YD]US2003206954 (LERNER E ITZHAK [IL], et al) [YD] 1-22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0013] , [0024] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031]; claim 10 *; | [Y]US2003216358 (MUCHMORE DOUGLAS BOYER [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * paragraph [0006]; claim - *; | [Y] - JOHNELL O ET AL, "Effects of raloxifene (RLX), alendronate (ALN) and RLX+ALN on bone mineral density (BMD) and biochemical markers of bone turnover in postmenopausal women with osteoporosis", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, & TWENTY-FIRST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH; ST. LOUIS, MISSOURI, USA; SEPTEMBER 30-OCTOBER 4, 1999, (199909), vol. 14, no. SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0884-0431, page S157, XP009047426 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * | [YD] - JOHNELL OLOF ET AL, "Additive effects of raloxifene and alendronate on bone density and biochemical markers of bone remodeling in postmenopausal women with osteoporosis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (200203), vol. 87, no. 3, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 985 - 992, XP002327483 [YD] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.87.3.985 | [Y] - BURCKHARDT P, "SELECTIVE ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS (SERM): NEUE SUBSTANZEN FUERDIE HORMONERSATZTHERAPIE", SCHWEIZERISCHE MEDIZINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, SCHWABE, BASEL, CH, (19991211), vol. 129, ISSN 0036-7672, pages 1926 - 1930, XP000937653 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * page 1930, column R * | [Y] - WATTS N B, "TREATMENT OF OSTEOPOROSIS WITH BISPHOSPHONATES", RHEUMATIC DISEASES CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200102), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0889-857X, pages 197 - 214, XP008008277 [Y] 1-22 * Combination of bisphosphonates with raloxifen.; page 204, paragraph 3 * * page 208, Summary * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0889-857X(05)70194-0 | [Y] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002327484 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * |