15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
14.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
08.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
15.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
02.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
05.08.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.10.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
20.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
26.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|