Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9782323 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2014207036 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414215381 | 17.03.2014 | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US14354805 | 02.06.2005 | US94424007 | 21.11.2007 | US81359710 | 11.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8256459 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2012 | B2 | US2010276619 | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US37183709 | 16.02.2009 | US83774210 | 16.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8734369 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2014 | B2 | US2010249679 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US14354805 | 02.06.2005 | US94424007 | 21.11.2007 | US81359710 | 11.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7810519 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2010 | B2 | US2009146092 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US37183709 | 16.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008103422 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US14354805 | 02.06.2005 | US94424007 | 21.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7354411 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2008 | B2 | US2005222526 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US14354805 | 02.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7871387 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2011 | B2 | US2005187503 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7354410 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2008 | B2 | US2005187500 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7282038 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2007 | B2 | US2005187499 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7490620 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2009 | B2 | US2005184264 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007522892 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4686485B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2011 | B2 | JP2007522891 | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4602996B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | B2 | JP2007522890 | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4571156B | Global Dossier | 27.10.2010 | B2 | JP2007522889 | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2319476 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | A3 | EP2319476 | 11.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | EP05713933 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2314268 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2020 | B1 | EP2314268 | 18.06.2014 | A3 | EP2314268 | 27.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | EP05713933 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1720505 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2011 | B1 | EP1720505 | 15.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1720504 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | B1 | EP1720504 | 15.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1718894 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2010 | B1 | EP1718894 | 08.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005217424B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2008 | B2 | AU2005217424 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005216934B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | B2 | AU2005216934 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005216924B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2009 | B2 | AU2005216924 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005216923B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2009 | B2 | AU2005216923 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1722738 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2013 | B1 | EP1722738 | 22.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE468834T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE473390T | 15.07.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE536851T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2552331 | 28.04.2009 | C | CA2552331 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2552353 | 28.04.2009 | C | CA2552353 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2552354 | 06.07.2010 | C | CA2552354 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2552355 | 23.12.2008 | C | CA2552355 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102614074B | 23.09.2015 | B | CN102614074 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200580004326 | 23.02.2005 | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1917842B | 13.06.2012 | B | CN1917842 | 21.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1917843B | 01.09.2010 | B | CN1917843 | 21.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1917844 | 21.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1918422B | 21.12.2011 | B | CN1918422 | 21.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005021460D1 | 08.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005022165D1 | 19.08.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1720504T | 23.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2348542T | 09.12.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2378886T | 18.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2414880T | 23.07.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1091390 | 19.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL176409 | 31.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL176410 | 16.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL176433 | 31.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20064255L | 20.09.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20064256L | 20.09.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05599 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20064281L | 21.09.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20064310L | 22.09.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05598 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ548557 | 26.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432305 | 23.02.2005 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78463905 | 23.02.2005 | US78460405 | 23.02.2005 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1720504T | 30.11.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | EP05713935 | 23.02.2005 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05600 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1720505T | 31.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | EP05723526 | 23.02.2005 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US05679 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005083313 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005082316 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2005 | A3 | WO2005082316 | 09.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005082315 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005082314 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070001964 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100918718B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | B1 | KR20080091404 | 10.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100914569B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2009 | B1 | KR20070027506 | 09.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100873540B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | B1 | KR20070007085 | 12.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100868148B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2008 | B1 | KR20060133587 | 26.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2346546T | 18.10.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2806930T | 19.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US78432304 | 23.02.2004 | US78463904 | 23.02.2004 | US78460704 | 23.02.2004 | US78460404 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Divisional application | EP2314268 | EP2319476 |