07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
26.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
19.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
15.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
25.12.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
20.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
23.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
16.01.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.08.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.11.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2007 |
First examination report |
|
10.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
20.10.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
20.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
12.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|