EP1723143 - AMINO CYCLOPROPANE CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS BRADYKININ ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCK, Mark, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
FENG, Dong-Mei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
KUDUK, Scott 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05714101.2 | 25.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US06230 | Priority number, date | US20040549379P | 02.03.2004 Original published format: US 549379 P | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005085198 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723143 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723143 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 02.10.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOCYCLOPROPANCARBONSÄUREAMIDDERIVATE ALS BRADYKININANTAGONISTEN | [2006/47] | English: | AMINO CYCLOPROPANE CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS BRADYKININ ANTAGONISTS | [2006/47] | French: | DERIVES D AMINO CYCLOPROPANE CARBOXAMIDE UTILISES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE LA BRADYKININE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | LU | 25.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03065789 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-41 *; | [Y]WO03066577 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10* claims 1-42 *; | [PX]WO2004019868 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-20,24-32 *; | [PX]WO2005016886 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-3,5,6,11-13 * |