EP1753563 - MELTING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hindenlang GmbH Neurott 1 74931 Lobbach / DE | [2012/30] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Advanced Magnesium Technologies Pty Ltd. Office 10 Level 8 139 Macquarie Street Sydney NSW 2000 / AU | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Advanced Magnesium Technologies Pty Ltd. Suite 5 Level 4 350 George Street Sydney NSW 2000 / AU | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Advanced Magnesium Technologies Pty Ltd. 5th Floor 30 Little Crib Street Milton QLD 4068 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEKKEDAL, Dag c/-Nordiske Industriovner A/S Stenrudveien 9 N-2335 Stange / NO | 02 /
BOLSTAD, Jan August Vesterasvej 3 N-3960 Stathelle / NO | 03 /
MCGLADE, Paul GPO Box 668 Brisbane, Queensland 4001 / AU | 04 /
CALVI, John Adrian 13 Haigh Street Bentleigh East Melbourne, Victoria 3165 / AU | [2012/24] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
BAEKKEDAL, Dag c/-Nordiske Industriovner A/S Stenrudveien 9 N-2335 Stange / NO | ||
02 /
BOLSTAD, Jan August Vesterasvej 3 N-3960 Stathelle / NO | |||
03 /
MCGLADE, Paul GPO Box 668 Brisbane, Queensland 4001 / AU | |||
04 /
CALVI, John Adrian 13 Haigh Street, Bentleigh East Melbourne, Victoria 3165 / AU | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2007/08] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street, Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05714326.5 | 30.03.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005AU00457 | Priority number, date | AU20040901679 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: AU 2004901679 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095026 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753563 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1753563 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1753563 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F27D27/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
F27D27/00 (EP,US);
B22D23/06 (EP,US);
F27B14/08 (EP,US);
Y10S266/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | B22D23/06, B22D21/04, B22D41/62, F27D23/04, F27B14/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | SCHMELZVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2007/08] | English: | MELTING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2007/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FUSION | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2005 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3997336 (VAN LINDEN JAN H L, et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 1-6; claims 1-22 *; | [Y]JPS6299423 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *; | [Y]US6068812 (AREAUX LARRY D [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 1-6; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]US6074455 (VAN LINDEN JAN H L [US], et al) [Y] 1-17* figures 1-6; claims 1-26 *; | [Y]EP1229250 (THUT BRUNO H [US]) [Y] 1-17 * figures 1-18; claims 1-26 *; | [Y]US2003197313 (AREAUX LARRY D [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 1-14; claims 1-16 * | International search | [X]US3935003 (STEINKE THEODORE D, et al); | [X]US4322245 (CLAXTON RAYMOND J); | [A]US4572485 (ENGELBERG FRANZ [DE], et al); | [X]US4931091 (WAITE PETER D [CA], et al); | [X]EP0418481 (VHG GIESSEREI UND HUETTENWERKS [DE]); | [X]US5908488 (SCHROEDER DOMINIK [DE], et al); | [X]US5984999 (AREAUX LARRY D [US]); | [XP]CA2451735 (RAUCH FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH I [AT]) |