EP1745589 - System and method for configuring devices for secure operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/04] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING DEVICES FOR SECURE OPERATIONS | ||
[2013/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Neil, P. 550 Little Dover Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | 02 /
BROWN, Michael, K. 1938 Mapleridge Drive Peterborough, Ontario K9K 2E4 / CA | 03 /
BROWN, Michael, S. 350 University Downs Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4B1 / CA | 04 /
KIRKUP, Michael, G. 224 Dearborn Blvd. Waterloo, Ontario N2J 4Y3 / CA | 05 /
LITTLE, Herbert, A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | 06 /
MACFARLANE, David, Victor 518 Beaverwood Street Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2M2 / CA | 07 /
ROBERTSON, Ian, M. 209 Bristol Street Waterloo, Ontario N2J 1H4 / CA | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
ADAMS, Neil, P. 550 Little Dover Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | ||
02 /
BROWN, Michael, K. 1938 Mapleridge Drive Peterborough, Ontario K9K 2E4 / CA | |||
03 /
BROWN, Michael, S. 350 University Downs Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4B1 / CA | |||
04 /
KIRKUP, Michael, G. 413 Exmoor Street Waterloo, Ontario N2K 3X5 / CA | |||
05 /
LITTLE, Herbert, A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | |||
06 /
MACFARLANE, David, Victor 518 Beaverwood Street Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2M2 / CA | |||
07 /
ROBERTSON, Ian, M. 209 Bristol Street Waterloo, Ontario N2J 1H4 / CA | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Schmit Chretien Schihin & Mahler Baaderstraße 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05714536.9 | 25.02.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005CA00294 | Priority number, date | US20040567137P | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 567137 P | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107132 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745589 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745589 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04W12/088 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | 23.11.2006 | BA | 23.11.2006 | HR | 23.11.2006 | LV | 23.11.2006 | MK | 23.11.2006 | YU | 23.11.2006 | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Konfigurieren von Einrichtungen für sichere Operationen | [2013/47] | English: | System and method for configuring devices for secure operations | [2013/47] | French: | Système et procédé permettant de configurer des dispositifs pour des opérations sécurisées | [2013/47] |
Former [2007/04] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN VON EINRICHTUNGEN FÜR SICHERE OPERATIONEN | ||
Former [2007/04] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING DEVICES FOR SECURE OPERATIONS | ||
Former [2007/04] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CONFIGURER DES DISPOSITIFS POUR DES OPERATIONS SECURISEES | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2005 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | IT | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | IE | 25.02.2015 | LU | 25.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GAVRILA, S. I. ; KOROLEV, V. ; JANSEN, W. A.; KARYGIANNIS, T, "Assigning and Enforcing Security Policies on Handheld Devices", CANADIAN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SECURITY SYMPOSIUM, Ottawa, Canada, (20020517), pages 0 - 7, URL: http://csrc.nist.gov/mobilesecurity/Publications/MobileDeviceSecurity.pdf, XP002440113 [X] 1-22 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 5 * | International search | [X]WO0069120 (WATCHGUARD TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]US6202157 (BROWNLIE MICHAEL [CA], et al); | [AP]US6732168 (BEARDEN MARK JOSEPH [US], et al) |