EP1711370 - VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINUTH, Karl-Heinz Malmsheimer Weg 15 71120 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
PFAHLER, Karl Mühlrain 22 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
RENNER, Lothar Kinzigstrasse 14 71154 Nufringen / DE | [2006/42] | Application number, filing date | 05715195.3 | 20.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005EP00518 | Priority number, date | DE20041005573 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004005573 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075245 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711370 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/56 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B60N2/5635 (EP,US);
B60N2/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/19] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2006/42] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT | [2006/42] | French: | SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19805173 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [A]DE10134383 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19847384 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19804284 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19804284 |