EP1720540 - SATRAPLATIN FOR TREATING RESISTANT OR REFRACTORY TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/46] | METHODS FOR TREATING RESISTANT OR REFRACTORY TUMORS | ||
[2007/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GPC Biotech AG Fraunhoferstrasse 20 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALIGIURI, Maureen 159 Pine Ridge Rd. Reading, MA 01867 / US | 02 /
WOSIKOWSKI-BUTERS, Katja Minervaweg 6 85586 Poing / DE | 03 /
CASAZZA, Anna Maria 40 Canady Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
CALIGIURI, Maureen 159 Pine Ridge Rd. Reading, MA 01867 / US | ||
02 /
WOSIKOWSKI-BUTERS, Katja Minervaweg 6 85586 Poing / DE | |||
03 /
CASAZZA, Anne Maria 40 Canady Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
CALIGIURI, Maureen 159 Pine Ridge Rd. Reading, MA 01867 / US | ||
02 /
WOSIKOWSKI-BUTERS, Katja Seerosenstrasse 3 85586 Poing / DE | |||
03 /
CASAZZA, Anne Maria 40 Canady Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05715410.6 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005EP01733 | Priority number, date | US20040546097P | 18.02.2004 Original published format: US 546097 P | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005077385 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720540 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720540 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/282, A61P35/00, A61K33/24 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/282, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | 18.09.2006 | BA | 18.09.2006 | HR | 18.09.2006 | LV | 18.09.2006 | MK | 18.09.2006 | YU | 18.09.2006 | Title | German: | SATRAPLATIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RESISTENTEN ODER REFRKATÄREN TUMOREN | [2007/34] | English: | SATRAPLATIN FOR TREATING RESISTANT OR REFRACTORY TUMORS | [2007/34] | French: | SATRAPLATIN DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS RESISTANTES OU REFRACTAIRES | [2007/34] |
Former [2006/46] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RESISTENTEN ODER REFRKATÄREN TUMOREN | ||
Former [2006/46] | METHODS FOR TREATING RESISTANT OR REFRACTORY TUMORS | ||
Former [2006/46] | TRAITEMENTS DE TUMEURS RESISTANTES OU REFRACTAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 02.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08102968.8 / EP1967189 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6025473 (DEELEY ROGER G [CA], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 6, lines 20-24 *; | [PX]WO2004105761 (PHARMA MAR SAU [ES], et al) [PX] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [PX] - PLASENCIA CARMEN ET AL, "Antiproliferative effects of ZD0473 (AMD473) in combination with 5-Fluorouracil or SN38 in human colorectal cancer cell lines", INVESTIGATIONAL NEW DRUGS, (200411), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 0167-6997, pages 399 - 409, XP002330769 [PX] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:DRUG.0000036682.99818.71 | [X] - SOULIE P ET AL, "Oxaliplatin/cisplatin (L-OHP/CDDP) Combination in Heavily Pretreated Ovarian Cancer", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (199708), vol. 33, no. 9, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 1400 - 1406, XP004284356 [X] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(97)00122-6 | [X] - ZELEK L ET AL, "Phase II study of oxaliplatin and fluorouracil in taxane- and anthracycline-pretreated breast cancer patients.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY. 15 MAY 2002, (20020515), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 2551 - 2558, XP002330770 [X] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2002.06.164 | [X] - SHARP S Y ET AL, "Lack of a role for MRP1 in platinum drug resistance in human ovarian cancer cell lines", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (199807), vol. 78, no. 2, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 175 - 180, XP009048459 [X] 1-38 * abstract * | [X] - MEDINA-GUNDRUM LETICIA ET AL, "AMD473 (ZD0473) exhibits marked in vitro anticancer activity in human tumor specimens taken directly from patients.", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (200304), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 275 - 280, XP009048496 [X] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-200304000-00004 | [X] - SMITH D C, "Chemotherapy for hormone refractory prostate cancer", UROLOGIC CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA 1999 UNITED STATES, (1999), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0094-0143, pages 323 - 331, XP009048474 [X] 1-38 * page 329, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0094-0143(05)70072-0 | by applicant | - E. K. ROWINSKY; R. C. DONEHOWER, PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1991), vol. 52, pages 35 - 84 | - J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 1711 - 17124 | - VICKERS ET AL., MOL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1989), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 157 - 164 | - KAPOOR ET AL., ONCOLOGY RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 7, pages 83 - 95 | - ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, page 474482 | - CLIN CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 2778 - 2785 | - CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, no. 37, pages 6034 - 6 | - CANCER RES, (1994), vol. 54, pages 152 - 158 | - INT J CANCER, (1997), vol. 71, pages 35 - 41 |