EP1737608 - METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/01] | METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT ESPECIALLY FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM | ||
[2008/24] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/45] | For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Marnheimer Strasse 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | |||
Former [2008/41] | For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Mannheimer Str. 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | |||
Former [2007/52] | For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Mannheimer Strasse 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | |||
Former [2007/39] | For:DE
DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Mannheimer Strasse 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | |||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Mannheimer Strasse 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | |||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BorgWarner Turbo Systems GmbH Mannheimer Strasse 85/87 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEN, Wilfried Von der Heide 1a 21218 Seevetal-Emmelndorf / DE | 02 /
ELFELDT, Jan, Peter Kleiner Kielort 12 20144 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
HALVES, Michael Ottenser Hauptstrasse 46 22765 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
HÜLSBERG, Thomas Weg zur Mühle 54 21244 Buchholz / DE | 05 /
KLUSSMANN, Uwe Bloumstücken 6 29646 Bispingen / DE | 06 /
KUZI, Hildwin Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 54/1 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 07 /
NUHN, Holger Am Wörn 15 29640 Schneverdingen / DE | 08 /
PÜNJER, Ralf Friedrich-Scheunemann-Strasse 19 21217 Seevetal/Flesstedt / DE | 09 /
REINHARDT, Olav Baurstrasse 57 22607 Hamburg / DE | 10 /
RIEWERT, Dirk Osdorfer Redder 40 b 22589 Hamburg / DE | 11 /
RIGGERS, Alfred Waldweg 1 27419 Freetz-Lengenbostel / DE | 12 /
STERNAL, Thorsten bergfeld 32 21647 Moisburg / DE | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05715467.6 | 23.02.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP01873 | Priority number, date | DE20041009109 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009109 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080045 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737608 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1737608 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1737608 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/32, B23K9/23, F01N7/10, F01N7/18 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K26/323 (EP,US);
B23K9/0282 (EP,US);
B23K9/232 (EP,US);
F01N13/102 (EP,US);
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F02B67/10 (EP,US);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US);
B23K2101/04 (EP,US);
B23K2103/06 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
F01N2450/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2007/22] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PULS-SCHWEISSEN EINES BLECHBAUTEILS WIE EIN ROHR MIT EINEM GUSSMETALLBAUTEIL WIE EINE ÖFFNUNG EINES GEHÄUSES FÜR ABGASANLAGE | [2008/24] | English: | METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM | [2008/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE PAR IMPULSIONS D'UN ELEMENT EN TOLE TEL QU'UN TUBE AVEC UN ELEMENT EN METAL COULE TEL QU'UNE OUVERTURE DE BOITIER POUR UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/01] | VERFAHREN ZUM PULS-SCHWEISSEN EINES BLECHBAUTEILS WIE EIN ROHR MIT EINEM GUSSMETALLBAUTEIL WIE EINE ÖFFNUNG EINES GEHÄUSES INSBESONDERE FÜR ABGASANLAGE | ||
Former [2007/01] | METHOD FOR PULSE WELDING A SHEET METAL PART SUCH AS A PIPE TO A CAST METAL PART SUCH AS A HOUSING PORT ESPECIALLY FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM | ||
Former [2007/01] | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE PAR IMPULSIONS D'UN ELEMENT EN TOLE TEL QU'UN TUBE AVEC UN ELEMENT EN METAL COULE TEL QU'UNE OUVERTURE DE BOITIER, NOTAMMENT POUR UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2009
11.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | 02
05.08.2009
13.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Friedrich Boysen GmbH & Co. KG Friedrich-Boysen-Strasse 14-17 D-72213 Altensteig / DE Opponent's representative Thul, Stephan, et al, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2009/38] | 09.09.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.12.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.07.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/47] | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.2011 | Appeal received No. T1467/11 | 06.10.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 24.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH10314948 ; | [XAY]EP0939208 (ZEUNA STAERKER KG [DE]) [X] 10,11,13,16,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * figure 1 * [A] 12,15,17,19 [Y] 2,6-9; | [Y]DE19808383 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 2, lines 5-21 *; | [X]US5268555 (JONES MARSHALL G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10 * column 2, lines 25-28 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 8; figure 1b; claim 3 *; | [XA]DE19721092 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 10,11,13,14 * column 2, lines 29-31; figure . * [A] 18; | [X]EP0921052 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure -; claims 1,12,13 *; | [A]EP0761939 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 7,12,15,17,19,7-9,12,15,17,19; | [AD]DE10022052 (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 17,19 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10314948 A 19981202 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3,5,10 * abstract * [Y] 2,6-9 |