EP1727955 - SLIDE RAIL FOR A DOOR CLOSER OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dorma GmbH + Co. KG DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2010/29] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states DORMA GMBH & CO. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Bernd Loh 18 58339 Breckerfeld / DE | [2006/49] | Application number, filing date | 05715807.3 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005EP02402 | Priority number, date | DE20041012638 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004012638 | [2006/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088051 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727955 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727955 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/22 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
E05F3/22 (EP,US);
E05F3/227 (EP,US);
E05F2003/228 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/53 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITSCHIENE FÜR EINEN TÜRSCHLIESSER ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2006/49] | English: | SLIDE RAIL FOR A DOOR CLOSER OR THE LIKE | [2006/49] | French: | GLISSIERE POUR SYSTEME DE FERMETURE DE PORTE OU ANALOGUE | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | HU | 23.06.2010 | IE | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | AT | 08.03.2011 | LU | 08.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
AT | 08.03.2011 | ||
LU | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
AT | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CZ | 23.06.2010 | |
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | EE | 23.06.2010 | |
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | LT | 23.06.2010 | |
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | LT | 23.06.2010 | |
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | LT | 23.06.2010 | |
SI | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19642275 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,11,12,15,17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9849419 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,13,14* page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 3 *; | [X]DE10016984 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE10023761 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,15,16 * paragraph [0016]; figure 2; claim 3 * |