EP1735800 - WINDING FOR A TRANSFORMER OR A COIL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Benjamin Ennertstrasse 16 59955 Winterberg / DE | 02 /
GRÜTTNER, Christian Breslauer Strasse 30a 59602 Rüthen / DE | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
WEBER, Benjamin Ennertstrasse 16 59955 Winterberg / DE | ||
02 /
GRÜTTNER, Christian Wagenfeldstrasse 18 59597 Erwitte / DE | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05715902.2 | 10.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005EP02520 | Priority number, date | DE20041016197 | 01.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004016197 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005098881 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735800 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32, H01F41/06 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H01F27/323 (EP,US);
H01F41/063 (EP,US);
H01F2027/328 (EP,US);
H01F27/2823 (EP,US);
H01F27/2847 (EP,US);
H01F41/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WICKLUNG FÜR EINEN TRANSFORMATOR ODER EINE SPULE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2006/52] | English: | WINDING FOR A TRANSFORMER OR A COIL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/52] | French: | ENROULEMENT D'UN TRANSFORMATEUR OU D'UNE BOBINE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5528820 (COLLIER HOWARD I J [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 62; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB981385 (BRITISH INSULATED CALLENDERS) [A] 4,17 * page 2, line 57 - line 83; figure . *; | [A]US3410738 (GORTON JR WILLIAM S) [A] 5,18 * column 5, line 33 - line 46; figure 4 *; | [A]US5262746 (MASUDA SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 7,8,20,21 * column 1, line 25 - line 41; figure 1 * |