EP1604324 - FLIGHT COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWA-F. RIEHLE GMBH & CO KG Gottlieb-Wolfer-Strasse 6 73770 Denkendorf / DE | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states IWA-F. RIEHLE GMBH & CO KG Gottlieb-Wolfer-Strasse 6 73770 Denkerdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEHLE, Harald Anna-Schieber-Weg 18 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Friz, Oliver Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Friz, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05716035.0 | 14.03.2005 | [2005/50] | WO2005EP02691 | Priority number, date | DE20041013571 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004013571 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005091208 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604324 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604324 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06G1/00, G06G1/08 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G06G1/0052 (EP);
G06G1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGRECHNER | [2005/50] | English: | FLIGHT COMPUTER | [2005/50] | French: | CALCULATEUR DE VOL | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 06.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | IE | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | LT | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | PL | 16.01.2008 | RO | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | SK | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | AT | 14.03.2008 | LU | 14.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | IS | 16.05.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | HU | 17.07.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
AT | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 14.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
AT | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 14.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
AT | 14.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
LT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
IS | 16.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2585618 (BATORI OSCAR E) [A] 1,7,8,10* column 4, line 38 - column 7, line 33; figure 1 * |