EP1738172 - METHOD FOR FUNCTIONALIZING BIOSENSOR CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREY, Alexander Eichenstr. 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Franz Herbergstrasse 25B 80995 München / DE | 03 /
SCHINDLER-BAUER, Petra Zugspitzstr. 23 85591 München / DE | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 05716224.0 | 18.03.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP02941 | Priority number, date | DE20041019357 | 21.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019357 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106478 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738172 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1738172 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, B81B7/04, B01J19/00, H01L21/027 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N27/3277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/28] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKTIONALISIERUNG VON BIOSENSOR-CHIPS | [2007/01] | English: | METHOD FOR FUNCTIONALIZING BIOSENSOR CHIPS | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNALISATION DE PUCES DE BIOCAPTEURS | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10052165 (GRAFINITY PHARMACEUTICAL DESIG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,20,21 * column 3, paragraphs 13,14 * * column 4, paragraph 17 - column 5, paragraph 24 * * column 6, paragraph 38 * * column 6, paragraphs 42-45 * * column 7, paragraph 47 * * column 7, paragraph 52 - column 9, paragraph 57 * * column 9, paragraph 62 * * figures 2-4; claims 1,4,5,12,14,17,27-32 * [Y] 1-23; | [XY]WO0075644 (ZEPTOSENS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,6,7,20,21,23 * page 10, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph L - page 21, paragraph 1 * * examples 1a,1b * [Y] 1-23; | [XY]WO0120330 (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US], et al) [X] 1,6,20 * page 7, lines 9-13 * * page 11, lines 1-25 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 6 * * page 15, line 7 - page 16, line 32 * * page 20, lines 4-9 * * page 27, lines 7-27 * * figures 1,3; examples 5.1,5.3,5.4 * [Y] 1-23; | [XY]WO02086479 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,13,19,20,23 * page 1, line 18 - page 5, line 6 * * page 9, line 27 - page 12, line 27 * * figures 2a-22e,3,4a-4f * [Y] 1-23; | [X]WO0175150 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,20 * page 7, line 9 - page 12, line 34 * * page 30, line 19 - page 35, line 16 * * figures 12,13 *; | [Y] - THEWES, R ET AL., "Sensor arrays for fully-electronic DNA detection on CMOS", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2002. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. ISSCC. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL., (20020203), vol. 1, pages 350 - 473, XP002341179 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.2002.993076 | [A] - RUBINA A Y ET AL, "Hydrogel drop microchips with immobilized DNA: properties and methods for large-scale production", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20040201), vol. 325, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 92 - 106, XP004483538 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2003.10.010 |