EP1861872 - METHOD FOR LINKING A CHIP AND A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIL, Michael Tessinerstrasse 51 81475 München / DE | 02 /
KOENIG, Martin Hindelangstrasse 8 81475 München / DE | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05716368.5 | 24.03.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005EP03170 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006099885 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861872 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L2224/16238 (EP);
H01L2224/2929 (EP);
H01L2224/29339 (EP);
H01L2224/29344 (EP);
H01L2224/29347 (EP);
H01L2224/29355 (EP);
H01L2224/29499 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83192 (EP);
H01L2224/83193 (EP);
H01L2224/83851 (EP);
H01L2224/83855 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01047 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/0665 (EP);
H01L2924/0781 (EP);
H01L2924/07811 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
H01L2924/19043 (EP);
H05K2203/0278 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | FR, NL [2008/27] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES CHIPS UND EINES SUBSTRATS | [2007/49] | English: | METHOD FOR LINKING A CHIP AND A SUBSTRATE | [2007/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONNEXION D'UNE PUCE ET D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004016911 (KHANNA S KUMAR [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0015] , [0023] , [0030] , [0039] - [0041]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4; | [XA]EP1387398 (DELO INDUSTRIEKLEBSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0003] , [0013] , [0015] * [A] 4; | [YA]US6297564 (CHUNG KEVIN KWONG-TAI [US]) [Y] 4 * column 5, line 29 - line 55 * * column 6, line 28 - line 31 * [A] 1-3,5-7; | [A]DE10151657 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0030]; claims 1,7,8 *; | [DA]DE10117929 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0017] , [0033] , [0034] * | Examination | - FEIL M. ET AL, "The challenge of ultra thin chip assembly", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY,, ECTC '04. PROCEEDINGS LAS VEGAS, NV, USA, (20040601), vol. 1, pages 35 - 40 | - LIONG S. ET AL, "CONDUCTIVITY IMPROVEMENT OF THERMOPLASTIC ISOTROPICALLY CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20020528), pages 1140 - 1146, XP001210988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.2002.1008247 |