EP1720865 - 2-PYRIDINYLETHYLCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 16 rue Jean-Marie-Leclair 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren James Graf-Adolf-Strasse 7 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
RIECK, Heiko 29, allée Buffon F-69110 Sainte Foy-lès-Lyon / FR | 03 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 56 Cours de la Liberté F-69003 LYON / FR | 04 /
DESBORDES, Philippe 30 rue Bancel F-69007 LYON / FR | 05 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny F-69250 CURIS AU MONT D'OR / FR | 06 /
GENIX, Pierre 14 rue Duviard F-69004 LYON / FR | 07 /
VILLIER, Alain Les Terres de Tourvéon-Batim. A 2 chemin du Champ F-69660 COLLONGES AU MONT D'OR / FR | [2015/01] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren James Graf-Adolf-Strasse 7 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
RIECK, Heiko 29, allée Buffon F-69110 Sainte Foy-lès-Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 56 Cours de la Liberté F-69003 LYON / FR | |||
04 /
DESBORDES, Philippe 30 rue Bancel F-69007 LYON / FR | |||
05 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge, Route d'Albigny F-69250 CURIS AU MONT D'OR / FR | |||
06 /
GENIX, Pierre 14 rue Duviard F-69004 LYON / FR | |||
07 /
VILLIER, Alain Les Terres de Tourvéon-Batim. A 2 chemin du Champ F-69660 COLLONGES AU MONT D'OR / FR | |||
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren James 25 montée Bonafous F-69004 LYON / FR | ||
02 /
RIECK, Heiko 29, allée Buffon F-69110 Sainte Foy-lès-Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 56 Cours de la Liberté F-69003 LYON / FR | |||
04 /
DESBORDES, Philippe 30 rue Bancel F-69007 LYON / FR | |||
05 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge, Route d'Albigny F-69250 CURIS AU MONT D'OR / FR | |||
06 /
GENIX, Pierre 14 rue Duviard F-69004 LYON / FR | |||
07 /
VILLIER, Alain 3 chemin des Garennes F-69450 SAINT CYR AU MONT D'OR / FR | |||
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren James 25 montée Bonafous F-69004 LYON / FR | ||
02 /
RIECK, Heiko 9 rue Claude Monet F-69110 Sainte Foy-lès-Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 36 rue de la Tête d'Or F-69006 LYON / FR | |||
04 /
DESBORDES, Philippe 30 rue Bancel F-69007 LYON / FR | |||
05 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge, Route d'Albigny F-69250 CURIS AU MONT D'OR / FR | |||
06 /
GENIX, Pierre 14 rue Duviard F-69004 LYON / FR | |||
07 /
VILLIER, Alain 3 chemin des Garennes F-69450 SAINT CYR AU MONT D'OR / FR | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Nowak, Alexander, et al Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration Law and Patents Patents and Licensing, Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Nowak, Alexander, et al Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Gerhards, Frank, et al Bayer CropScience SA Département Brevets et Licences 14-20 Rue Pierre Baizet BP 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05716432.9 | 01.03.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005EP03282 | Priority number, date | EP20040356029 | 03.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04356029 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085238 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720865 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720865 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N43/78, A01N43/40, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D417/12 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/46] | C07D409/12, C07D417/12, C07D401/12, A01N43/42, A01N43/78, A01N43/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | 2-PYRIDINYLETHYLCARBONSÄUREAMIDDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS FUNGIZIDE | [2006/46] | English: | 2-PYRIDINYLETHYLCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDES | [2006/46] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 2-PYRIDINYLÉTHYLCARBOXAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE FONGICIDES | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.11.2014 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 28.11.2014 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2005 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | IE | 01.03.2015 | LU | 01.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2015 | ||
LU | 01.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2015 | ||
LU | 01.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0144230 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,12 * Claim 6; Formula (VIII); example 4(2) *; | [X]WO9962901 (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12 * Example 2 *; | [X]WO0105769 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * Claims 1-4, 9-11, 16-26; Formula (I); compounds 229-230, 233, 243-244, 246-247, 483, 486-490, 508-512, 518 *; | [XD]WO0111965 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * Claims 1-8; Formulae (I) and I(q); Table D; Compounds 101, 111-112, 302, 310, 313, 319, 321, 325-326, 340, 605, 618, 635, 637-641, 644-646, 649-652, 654 *; | [X]WO2004016088 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * Claims 1-16; examples *; | [PX]EP1449841 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR]) [PX] 1-15* Claims 1-50; Formula (I); examples; Tables A-V * |