EP1718784 - INLET SYSTEM FOR AN MOCVD REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aixtron SE Dornkaulstrasse 2 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2014/34] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Aixtron SE Kaiserstrasse 98 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states AIXTRON AG Kaiserstrasse 98 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Aixtron AG Kackertstrasse 15-17 52072 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUELSBERG, Martin Kandelfeldstrasse , 8 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
CONOR, Martin Viktoriastrasse 52 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
STRAUCH, Gerhard, Karl Schönauer Friede 80 52072 Aachen / DE | 04 /
KAEPPELER, Johannes Zeisigweg 47 52146 Wuerselen / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
DAUELSBERG, Martin Kuckhoffstrasse 4 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
CONOR, Martin Viktoriastrasse 52 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
STRAUCH, Gerhard, Karl Schönauer Friede 80 52072 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
KAEPPELER, Johannes Zeisigweg 47 52146 Wuerselen / DE | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2021/48] |
Former [2006/45] | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05716769.4 | 23.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005EP50765 | Priority number, date | DE20041009130 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009130 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080631 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718784 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718784 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/40, C23C16/455, C30B25/14 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
C23C16/45568 (EP,US);
C23C16/455 (KR);
C23C16/00 (KR);
C30B25/14 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | C23C16/455, C30B25/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EINLASSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN MOCVD-REAKTOR | [2006/45] | English: | INLET SYSTEM FOR AN MOCVD REACTOR | [2006/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'ADMISSION POUR REACTEUR MOCVD | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2005 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | IE | 23.02.2022 | LU | 23.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 23.02.2005 | |
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.02.2005 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 01.12.2021 | |
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4961399 (FRIJLINK PETER M [FR]) [X] 1-19 * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 11; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US6218212 (SAITO TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,13 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 32 * * column 6, line 49 - line 67; figure 9; claims 1-5,16 *; | [X]JPH04254493 ; | [PX]DE10247921 (AIXTRON AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,6-9,13-19 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2,4; claims 1-4,6,13,14 *; | [AD]US2003177977 (STRAUCH GERD [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,3,5-9; claims 1,6 *; | [AD]US2004013801 (BREMSER MICHAEL [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-6; claims 1,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 037, Database accession no. (C - 1019), & JP04254493 A 19920909 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * | Examination | JPH09102461 |