EP1738162 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPERATION OF AN EXHAUST GAS ANALYZING SENSOR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITMEIER, Torsten Hauptstrasse 2 92442 Wackersdorf / DE | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 05717051.6 | 15.03.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP51178 | Priority number, date | DE20041018871 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004018871 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100970 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738162 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/419 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP,US);
G01N27/4065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/30] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ABGAS-ANALYSE-SENSORZELLE | [2007/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPERATION OF AN EXHAUST GAS ANALYZING SENSOR CELL | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE CELLULE DE DETECTEUR POUR L'ANALYSE DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6214207 (MIYATA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 18, line 41 - column 19, line 25; figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE19944181 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 3; figure . *; | [DA]DE10221392 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * |