EP1732925 - NOVEL N-(ALKOXYALKYL)CARBAMOYL- SUBSTITUTED 6-PHENYL-BENZONAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PDE3/4 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nycomed GmbH Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2007/32] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Altana Pharma AG Byk-Gulden-Str. 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 78476 Allensbach / DE | 02 /
KAUTZ, Ulrich Prof.-Schmider-Str. 12 78476 Allensbach / DE | 03 /
HATZELMANN, Armin Alter Wall 3 78467 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
BARSIG, Johannes Am alten Sägewerk 14 78467 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
MARX, Degenhard Obere Reute 15 78345 Moos / DE | 06 /
KLEY, Hans-Peter Hafnerstr. 12 78476 Allensbach / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 78476 Allensbach / DE | ||
02 /
KAUTZ, Ulrich Prof.-Schmider-Str. 12 78476 Allensbach / DE | |||
03 /
HATZELMANN, Armin Alter Wall 3 78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
04 /
BARSIG, Johannes Bleichenweg 11 78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
05 /
MARX, Degenhard Obere Reute 15 78345 Moos / DE | |||
06 /
KLEY, Hans-Peter Hafnerstr. 12 78476 Allensbach / DE | Representative(s) | Wild, Robert, et al Takeda GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78403 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Wild, Robert, et al Nycomed GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78406 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Wild, Robert, et al ALTANA Pharma AG P.O.Box 100 310 78403 Konstanz / DE | Application number, filing date | 05717070.6 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005EP51204 | Priority number, date | EP20040101101 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101101 | EP20040101111 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101111 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090345 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1732925 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/4745 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | 17.10.2006 | BA | 17.10.2006 | HR | 17.10.2006 | LV | 17.10.2006 | MK | 17.10.2006 | YU | 17.10.2006 | Title | German: | NEUE N-(ALKOXYALKYL)CARBAMOYLSUBSTITUIERTE 6-PHENYLBENZONAPHTHYRIDINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS PDE3/4-INHIBITOREN | [2006/51] | English: | NOVEL N-(ALKOXYALKYL)CARBAMOYL- SUBSTITUTED 6-PHENYL-BENZONAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PDE3/4 INHIBITORS | [2006/51] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE 6-PHÉNYL-BENZONAPHTHYRIDINE SUBSTITUÉ PAR UN GROUP N-(ALKOXYALKYL)CARBAMOYL ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE PDE3/4 | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9821208 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE], et al) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9957118 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE], et al) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * |