EP1735551 - SEALING ARRANGEMENT, PARTICULARLY FOR A DRYING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER-NADLINGER, Thomas Asparnstr. 22 A-3442 Langenrohr / AT | 02 /
HAASE, Christoph Habersdorf 3 A-3041 Asperhofen / AT | [2006/52] | Application number, filing date | 05717102.7 | 18.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005EP51268 | Priority number, date | DE20041017817 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017817 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100828 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735551 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735551 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/00 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
F16J15/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE TROCKENANORDNUNG | [2006/52] | English: | SEALING ARRANGEMENT, PARTICULARLY FOR A DRYING SYSTEM | [2006/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEIFICATION, EN PARTICULIER POUR DISPOSITIF DE SECHAGE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | IE | 10.12.2008 | LT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | GB | 18.03.2009 | LU | 18.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | IS | 10.04.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
GB | 18.03.2009 | ||
LU | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
GB | 18.03.2009 | ||
LU | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
GB | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | LT | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4343591 (HANNAN III WILLIAM F, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * column 1, line 52 - line 68 * * column 2, line 23 - line 33 * * column 3, line 20 - line 30; figure . *; | [A]DE9014461U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-6,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004056423 (STALJANSSENS ERIK COLLETTE DOM [BE]) [X] 1* abstract * |