15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
16.05.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
07.06.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
21.12.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
28.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
17.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
15.09.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
15.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
22.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|