EP1711361 - ROOF RETRACTABLE IN THE TRUNK OF A VEHICLE COMPRISING LATERAL DISPLACEABLE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles - SEBA 127, Rue Amelot 75011 Paris 11 / FR | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Heuliez 7 rue Louis Heuliez 79140 Cerizay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUEVEAU, Gérard "Amik Farm" F-79140 Le Pin / FR | 02 /
QUEVEAU, Paul Le Logis de la Chironnière F-79140 Montravers / FR | 03 /
GUILLIEZ, Jean-Marc Les Maisons Blanches F-79140 Cirieres / FR | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/42] | Novagraaf IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/42] | Breese Derambure Majerowicz 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05717545.7 | 03.02.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005FR00233 | Priority number, date | FR20040050207 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0450207 | [2006/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005082660 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711361 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711361 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B60J7/145 (EP,US);
B60J1/1823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUGKOFFERRAUM VERSENKBARES DACH, MIT VERLAGERBAREN SEITENTEILEN | [2013/04] | English: | ROOF RETRACTABLE IN THE TRUNK OF A VEHICLE COMPRISING LATERAL DISPLACEABLE ELEMENTS | [2006/42] | French: | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE DANS LE COFFRE ARRIÈRE D'UN VÉHICULE, COMPRENANT DES ÉLÉMENTS LATÉRAUX DÉPLACABLES | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/42] | IN DEN KOFFERRAUM EINES FAHRZEUGS EINZIEHBARES DACH MIT SEITLICH VERSCHIEBBAREN ELEMENTEN | ||
Former [2006/42] | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE DANS LE COFFRE ARRIERE D'UN VEHICULE, COMPRENANT DES ELEMENTS LATERAUX DEPLACABLES | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2005 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | IE | 03.02.2014 | LU | 03.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.02.2005 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19737259 (HOFFMANN RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 6 - column 9; figure - *; | [X]EP0678411 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 4 - line 31; figure - *; | [A]US2002093217 (LANGGUTH MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * |