EP1723520 - DATA CONTAINER FOR USER INTERFACE CONTENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Cambridge Limited 335 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge, CB4 0WN / GB | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNMER, Michael, Luke 59 Highworth Avenue Cambridge CB4 2BQ / GB | 02 /
DICKENS, Martin 21 Church Street Warmington Peterborough PE8 6TE / GB | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Simons, Alison, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Simons, Alison, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Wilson, Peter David, et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich Suffolk, IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05717753.7 | 18.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005GB00610 | Priority number, date | GB20040003709 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0403709 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005081101 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723520 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/44 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/38 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/1435 (KR);
G06F11/162 (KR);
G06F12/08 (KR);
G06F15/0225 (KR);
G06F16/23 (KR);
G06F16/80 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/0623 (KR);
G06F8/71 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F9/4451 (KR);
G06F9/451 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENBEHÄLTER FÜR BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN-INHALTSDATEN | [2006/47] | English: | DATA CONTAINER FOR USER INTERFACE CONTENT DATA | [2006/47] | French: | CONTENEUR DE DONNEES POUR DONNEES DE CONTENU D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 20.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/12] | 04.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0142909 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,8-10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003182626 (DAVIDOV ERAN [IL], et al) [A] 1,3-9,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X] - BAILEY E C, "Maximum RPM - Taking the Red Hat Package Manager to the Limit", RPM DOCUMENTATION, (199806), pages 3-13, 16-18, 33, 52, 200, 237 - 239, XP002351753 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SAPIRO M, "Re: setting executable bit on uploaded file - Message-ID: <[email protected]>", USENET MESSAGE, (20000418), comp.protocols.kermit.misc, URL: http://groups.google.com/group/comp.protocols.kermit.misc/msg/6d11eead89ed8edf?dmode=source&hl=en, (20051028), XP002351754 [A] 11,15 * the whole document * |